Garret et al v. Materia Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Garret and TLJ LLC
Defendant: William Powell, John Motta, Materia Group Inc, Anthony Bergin, Joseph Motta, Derek Muller and Materia Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01129
Filed: July 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Attorney Carolyn Robbs Bilanko for William Powell added; per #16 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Curt Roy Hineline on behalf of Defendant William Powell. (Hineline, Curt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Anthony Bergin (MW)
September 15, 2019 Filing 14 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, for Anthony Bergin by Plaintiffs David Garret, TLJ LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Edmondson, Joseph)
September 15, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on William Powell on 9/3/2019, filed by Plaintiff David Garret. (Edmondson, Joseph)
September 15, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Materia Group, LLC on 9/3/2019, filed by Plaintiff David Garret. (Edmondson, Joseph)
September 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to serve remaining defendants, filed by Plaintiff David Garret. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of J. Curtis Edmondson, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/16/2019, (Edmondson, Joseph)
September 8, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Materia Group, Inc. on 8/29/2019, filed by Plaintiff David Garret. (Edmondson, Joseph)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/17/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/24/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Materia Group LLC (Main Document), Materia Group Inc, Derek Muller, William Powell, John Motta, Joseph Motta (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Materia Group Inc, #2 Summons issued as to Derek Muller, #3 Summons issued as to William Powell, #4 Summons issued as to John Motta, #5 Summons issued as to Joseph Motta) (TH)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs David Garret, TLJ LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Unendorsed John Motta, #2 Summons Unendorsed Joseph Motta, #3 Summons Unendorsed Derek Muller, #4 Summons Undorsed Materia Group Inc, #5 Summons Unendorsed Material Group LLC, #6 Summons Unendorsed Willam Powell)(Edmondson, Joseph)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by David Garret (Edmondson, Joseph)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/31/2019. (SNP)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SNP)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (SNP)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
July 22, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SNP)
July 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5853283) Attorney Joseph Curtis Edmondson added to party David Garret(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Curtis Edmondson added to party TLJ, LLC(pty:pla), filed by David Garret, TLJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Edmondson, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garret et al v. Materia Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell
Represented By: Carolyn Robbs Bilanko
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Motta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Materia Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Motta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Materia Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Garret
Represented By: Joseph Curtis Edmondson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TLJ LLC
Represented By: Joseph Curtis Edmondson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?