Tura et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Damtew Assefa Woldegiorgis and Jemal Hussen Tura
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Emilia Bardini, San Francisco Asylum Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Daniel Renaud, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Anne Arries Corsano, Seattle Field Office of USCIS, Refugee, Asylum, and International Operations Directorate, Seattle District Office of USCIS, Jennifer B Higgins, Cynthia Munita, Kevin McAleenan and Refugee Asylum and International Operations Directorate
Case Number: 2:2019cv01131
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending defendants' response deadline to 12/2/2019 re parties' #5 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to extend response deadline by parties (Gugin, Patricia)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/16/2019. (AD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricia D Gugin on behalf of Defendants Emilia Bardini, Anne Arries Corsano, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Jennifer B Higgins, Kevin McAleenan, Cynthia Munita, Refugee Asylum and International Operations Directorate, Daniel Renaud, San Francisco Asylum Office, Seattle District Office of USCIS, Seattle Field Office of USCIS, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Gugin, Patricia)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Emilia Bardini, Anne Arries Corsano, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Jennifer B Higgins, Kevin McAleenan, Cynthia Munita, Refugee Asylum and International Operations Directorate, Daniel Renaud, San Francisco Asylum Office, Seattle District Office of USCIS, Seattle Field Office of USCIS, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(GT)
July 23, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (GT)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and for Issuance of a Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5854360) Attorney Jay W Gairson added to party Jemal Hussen Tura(pty:pla), Attorney Jay W Gairson added to party Damtew Assefa Woldegiorgis(pty:pla), filed by Damtew Assefa Woldegiorgis, Jemal Hussen Tura. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 Summons DHS, #4 Summons McAleenan, #5 Summons USCIS, #6 Summons Cuccinelli, #7 Summons Renaud, #8 Summons Seattle District Office, #9 Summons Corsano, #10 Summons Seattle Field Office, #11 Summons Munita, #12 Summons RAIO, #13 Summons Higgins, #14 Summons San Francisco Asylum Office, #15 Summons Bardini)(Gairson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tura et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilia Bardini
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Asylum Office
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Renaud
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Arries Corsano
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Field Office of USCIS
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refugee, Asylum, and International Operations Directorate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle District Office of USCIS
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer B Higgins
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Munita
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refugee Asylum and International Operations Directorate
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damtew Assefa Woldegiorgis
Represented By: Jay W Gairson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jemal Hussen Tura
Represented By: Jay W Gairson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?