Houston Specialty Insurance Company v. Sound Pacific LLC et al
Plaintiff: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Gunter Gerlach and Sound Pacific LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01149
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of Plaintiff, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 11/1/2019. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/17/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/24/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Houston International Insurance Group, Ltd. for Houston Specialty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Houston Specialty Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Gunter Gerlach, Sound Pacific LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/1/2019. (SNP)
July 25, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SNP)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5858816), filed by Houston Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sound Pacific LLC, #3 Summons Gunter Gellach)(Lether, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Specialty Insurance Company v. Sound Pacific LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunter Gerlach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sound Pacific LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel D Colito
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?