Hart v. Schneeweiss et al
Plaintiff: Jason Mark Hart
Defendant: Calvin Cogburn and Dan Schneeweiss
Case Number: 2:2019cv01193
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Attorney Allyson Janay Ferguson added for Calvin Cogburn, Dan Schneeweiss; per #6 Notice of Appearance. **DO NOT PRINT**(Jason Hart, Prisoner ID: 378403)(MW)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allyson Janay Ferguson on behalf of Defendants Calvin Cogburn, Dan Schneeweiss. **PRINT ALL**(Jason Hart, Prisoner ID: 378403)(Ferguson, Allyson)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Documents served electronically to Calvin Cogburn, PMHNP; Dr. Dan Schneeweiss on 8/30/2019.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jason Hart, Prisoner ID: 378403)(ST)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Jason Mark Hart against defendant(s) Calvin Cogburn, Dan Schneeweiss with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # SEA097342) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**91 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jason Hart, Prisoner ID: 378403)(ST)
August 13, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: (Receipt# SEA097342; $400.00) **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jason Hart, Prisoner ID: 378403)(ST)
August 13, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected **DO NOT PRINT**(Jason Hart, Prisoner ID: 378403)(ST)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $400.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 9/5/2019 to correct (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jason Hart, Prisoner ID: 378403)(SG)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jason Mark Hart (NO FILING FEE/NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**91 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jason Hart, Prisoner ID: 378403)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Schneeweiss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Cogburn
Represented By: Allyson Janay Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Schneeweiss
Represented By: Allyson Janay Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Mark Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?