In the Light Construction Management LLC v. Trendel
Plaintiff: In the Light Construction Management LLC
Defendant: Michael Trendel, Michael Lee Trendel, Michael Trendle, Mikhail Trundle, Mike Trundle, Michael Lee Lynn, Michael Trundle, Mikhail Tundl, Michael Lee Trendal and Mike Lee Trendel
Case Number: 2:2019cv01200
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/4/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/18/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Service by Plaintiff In the Light Construction Management LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barrera, Paul)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER allowing alternative service on Defendant Michael Lee Trendel re plaintiff's #6 Motion. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings, by Clerk, William M McCool. Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case. (KEB)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Paul A. Barrera filed by Plaintiff In the Light Construction Management LLC re #6 MOTION for Leave for alternative service by email (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Barrera, Paul)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave for alternative service by email, filed by Plaintiff In the Light Construction Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/13/2019, (Barrera, Paul)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Michael Lee Trendel (GMR)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS TO MICHAEL LEE TRENDEL by Plaintiff In the Light Construction Management LLC (Barrera, Paul)
August 2, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (GT)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by In the Light Construction Management LLC (Barrera, Paul)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff In the Light Construction Management LLC. (Barrera, Paul)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Michael Trendel (Receipt # 0981-5868851) Attorney Paul Andre Barrera added to party In the Light Construction Management LLC(pty:pla), filed by In the Light Construction Management LLC.(Barrera, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Light Construction Management LLC v. Trendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In the Light Construction Management LLC
Represented By: Paul Andre Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Trendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lee Trendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Trendle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhail Trundle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Trundle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lee Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Trundle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhail Tundl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lee Trendal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lee Trendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?