Landmark Technology A LLC v. The Essential Baking Company Inc
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology A, LLC and Landmark Technology A LLC
Defendant: The Essential Baking Company, Inc. and The Essential Baking Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01208
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/25/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/2/2019. (LC)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant The Essential Baking Company Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5893366 (Hodges, Benjamin) Disregard, filed in wrong case. Modified on 8/20/2019 (JF).
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J Hodges on behalf of Defendant The Essential Baking Company Inc. (Hodges, Benjamin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (GT)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant The Essential Baking Company Inc. (GT)
August 5, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Landmark Technology A, LLC (Lee, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Landmark Technology A, LLC (Lee, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) The Essential Baking Company, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5870085) Attorney John A Lee added to party Landmark Technology A, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Landmark Technology A, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Lee, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landmark Technology A LLC v. The Essential Baking Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology A, LLC
Represented By: John A Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology A LLC
Represented By: John A Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Essential Baking Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Essential Baking Company Inc
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?