Dirt Bike Safety Training LLC et al v. MotoVentures Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dirt Bike Safety Training, LLC d/b/a Dirt First Washington, Jason Sherman, Whitney Koeberle and Dirt Bike Safety Training LLC
Defendant: Gary LaPlante, MotoVentures, Inc. and MotoVentures Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01215
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Violation of the WA Franchise Investment Protection Act and Violation of the WA Consumer Protection Act against defendant(s) Gary LaPlante, MotoVentures Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Dirt Bike Safety Training LLC, Jason Sherman, Whitney Koeberle.(Kittle, Daniel)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Gary LaPlante (AE)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) MotoVentures Inc (AE) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/16/2019) (AE).
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, to Gary LaPlante by Plaintiffs Dirt Bike Safety Training LLC, Whitney Koeberle, Jason Sherman (Kittle, Daniel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, to MotoVentures, Inc. by Plaintiffs Dirt Bike Safety Training LLC, Whitney Koeberle, Jason Sherman (Kittle, Daniel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dirt Bike Safety Training LLC, Whitney Koeberle, Jason Sherman (Kittle, Daniel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Randall Paul Beighle on behalf of Plaintiffs Dirt Bike Safety Training LLC, Whitney Koeberle, Jason Sherman. (Beighle, Randall)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
August 5, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Dirt Bike Safety Training LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/12/2019. (GT)
August 5, 2019 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (GT)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for violation of the Washington Franchise Investment Protection Act, violation of the Washington Consumer Protection Act, Rescission, Declaratory Relief, and Damages against defendant(s) Gary LaPlante, MotoVentures, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5871357), filed by Dirt Bike Safety Training, LLC d/b/a Dirt First Washington, Jason Sherman, Whitney Koeberle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kittle, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dirt Bike Safety Training LLC et al v. MotoVentures Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirt Bike Safety Training, LLC d/b/a Dirt First Washington
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Sherman
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Koeberle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirt Bike Safety Training LLC
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary LaPlante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MotoVentures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MotoVentures Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?