Rochon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Paul E Rochon
Defendant: Attorney General of the U.S. Department of Justice, Western District of Washington Clerk and Deputy Clerk, Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01243
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine B. Watson on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Watson, Katherine)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Paul E Rochon. (Kaminski, Matthew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on USAO on 8/9/2019, filed by Plaintiff Paul E Rochon. (Kaminski, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to the case. (KMP)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
August 9, 2019 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GT)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Paul E Rochon (Receipt # 0981-5877073), filed by Paul E Rochon.(Kaminski, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul E Rochon
Represented By: Matthew Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western District of Washington Clerk and Deputy Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Katherine B. Watson
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?