McDonough v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Samuel McDonough and Samuel K McDonough
Defendant: Laura Hale, Robin Smith, King County Prosecutors Office and King County Prosecutor's Office
Case Number: 2:2019cv01248
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Plaintiff Samuel K McDonough. 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, Prison Trust Account Statement (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement)**26 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Samuel McDonough, Prisoner ID: 301287)(SG) Modified on 9/20/2019-correct title (SG).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Samuel McDonough, Prisoner ID: 301287)(MW) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/6/2019) (AE).
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #6 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 9/17/2019, Noting Date 9/20/2019, (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order Adopting Report and Recommendation)**10 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Samuel McDonough, Prisoner ID: 301287)(ST)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Samuel K McDonough. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Samuel McDonough, Prisoner ID: 301287)(ST)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Samuel K McDonough against defendant(s) Laura Hale, King County Prosecutor's Office, Robin Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)**49 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Samuel McDonough, Prisoner ID: 301287)(ST)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Samuel McDonough, Prisoner ID: 301287)(ST)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Samuel K McDonough. (Attachments: #1 Letter - explaining intention on filing Habeas Petition and Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement, #3 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #4 Exhibit Notice of Federal Appeal, #5 Exhibit Notice to Court, #6 Exhibit Pages 9-24, #7 Proposed Motion for Appointment of Counsel)**77 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Samuel McDonough, Prisoner ID: 301287)(SG)
August 14, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter **DO NOT PRINT**(Samuel McDonough, Prisoner ID: 301287)(SG)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS is blank or incomplete. Please answer all the questions on the enclosed application and return it to the Court as soon as possible.- ***Please fill out form completely and sign in all sections that require signature*** Filer has until 9/9/2019 to correct (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Samuel McDonough, Prisoner ID: 301287)(SG)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Samuel McDonough. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-Notice of Federal Appeal, #3 Exhibit 2 Note to Court - Incomplete, #4 Exhibit 3 Incomplete pages 9-24, #5 Prison Trust Account Statement, #6 Supplement IFP Paperwork, #7 Proposed Motion for Appointment of Counsel)**74 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Samuel McDonough, Prisoner ID: 301287)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonough v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel K McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Prosecutors Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Prosecutor's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?