Caril v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Leon Caril, II
Defendant: Western State Hospital, State of Washington, Marrisa, Daryl, Liz and Other Staff Members
Case Number: 2:2019cv01251
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Ronald B Leighton
2 Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
3 Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Response to Show Cause #12 Order due by 10/28/2019. (SP)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE or Amend #6 Complaint and Denying without Prejudice Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to adequately address the issues raised herein on or before October 28, 2019, the undersigned will recommend dismissal of this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. (SP- cc: plaintiff w/1983 forms, Order, Pro Se Instruction Sheet)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Leon Caril, II. (GMR)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #6 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Leon Caril, II. (GMR)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT, filed by Plaintiff Leon Caril, II. (SP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT, filed by Plaintiff Leon Caril, II. (SP- cc: plaintiff w/updated case docket)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Leon Caril, II. Noted by clerk for: 9/20/2019. (SP)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Daryl, Liz, Marrisa, Other Staff Members, State of Washington and Western State Hospital, filed by Leon Caril, II. (IFP Granted) (SP)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, PLRA Contact Person) (SP)
August 23, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected upon filing of #3 Prison Trust Account Statement. (SP)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Leon Caril, II. (SP)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Prison Trust Account Statement, filed by Plaintiff Leon Caril, II. (Attachments: #1 Letter re Prison Trust Account)(SP)
August 13, 2019 Reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton and Judge J Richard Creatura. **NOTE** This case was erroneously assigned a Seattle case number and judge(s), however, it has been determined that since the defendant(s) are located in Pierce and Thurston counties, the case falls under Tacoma's jurisdiction. The plaintiff is directed to file future documents under case number 19-cv-1251-RBL-JRC. (cc: Docket report sent to plaintiff via USPS w/this entry highlighted)(ST)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 9/9/2019 to correct. (sent to plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Leon Caril, II. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Letter re Prison Trust Account)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caril v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Caril, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marrisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Staff Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?