Chapin v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Richard Chapin
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan, The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01256
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 2 days. BENCH TRIAL is set for 7/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 12/13/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/29/2020, Discovery completed by 3/30/2020, Dispositive motions due by 4/28/2020, Motions in Limine due by 6/29/2020, Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2020, Trial briefs, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 7/20/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 4, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 2. (Evans, McKean)
October 4, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan.(Francis, Rebecca)
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Jansen, Per)
September 20, 2019 Reset Deadline: Having considered the parties' #21 STIPULATION to Extend the Microsoft Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint, and finding good cause, the Court GRANTS the stipulated motion. The Microsoft Defendants shall have up to and including 10/4/2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (VE)
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Microsoft Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint by parties (Francis, Rebecca)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Shelley Renee Hebert for defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amanda A. Sonneborn for defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shelley R. Hebert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5929069 (Jansen, Per)
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amanda A. Sonneborn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5929059 (Jansen, Per)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (text only) entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. Having considered the parties' #15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and finding good cause, the Court GRANTS the stipulated motion. The deadline for Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 10/4/2019. (VE)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/17/2019, (Jansen, Per)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/20/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/27/2019, Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan (Francis, Rebecca)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rebecca J Francis on behalf of Defendants Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan. (Francis, Rebecca)
August 30, 2019 Attorney D Michael Reilly for The Prudential Insurance Company of America added; per #10 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Jansen, Per)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Per Jansen on behalf of Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Jansen, Per)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan, The Prudential Insurance Company of America (MW)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan by Plaintiff Christopher Richard Chapin (Evans, McKean)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Microsoft Corporation by Plaintiff Christopher Richard Chapin (Evans, McKean)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Prudential Ins. Co. of America by Plaintiff Christopher Richard Chapin (Evans, McKean)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
August 12, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney McKean J Evans on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher Richard Chapin. (Evans, McKean)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Christopher Richard Chapin. (Evans, McKean)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5879823) Attorney McKean J Evans added to party Christopher Richard Chapin(pty:pla), filed by Christopher Richard Chapin. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Evans, McKean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapin v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation Welfare Plan
Represented By: Rebecca J Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Per Jansen
Represented By: Amanda A. Sonneborn
Represented By: Shelley Renee Hebert
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca J Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Richard Chapin
Represented By: McKean J Evans
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?