Ali v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Shoukat H Ali
Defendant: Paul W Jones and Michael Richard Pompeo
Case Number: 2:2019cv01260
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting deadline for parties to file a Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Paul W Jones, Michael Richard Pompeo (ST)
August 12, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ST)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Nature of Mandamus; Declaratory Statement/Judgment Action against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5880153) Attorney Bart Klein added to party Shoukat H Ali(pty:pla), filed by Shoukat H Ali. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Klein, Bart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Richard Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoukat H Ali
Represented By: Bart Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?