Williams v. Washington State Penitentiary et al
Plaintiff: Alfred E Williams
Defendant: Washington State Penitentiary and Arce
Case Number: 2:2019cv01265
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Proposed Document(s) filed by Alfred E Williams. Objections to R&R due by 10/10/2019, Noting Date 10/11/2019. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order, #2 R&R Proposed Judgment)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Alfred Williams, Prisoner ID: 410052)(GB)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Proposed Document(s). RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington State Penitentiary. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Alfred Williams, Prisoner ID: 410052)(SG)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $400.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 9/11/2019 to correct (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis Application) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Alfred Williams, Prisoner ID: 410052)(SG)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Plaintiff Alfred E Williams (NO FILING FEE/NO IFP) **10 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Alfred Williams, Prisoner ID: 410052)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Washington State Penitentiary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?