Strand v. Jewett et al
Plaintiff: Hamal Jacob Strand
Defendant: Mellissa Derksema, Carolyn Jewett and John Doe 1-2
Case Number: 2:2019cv01274
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT BY COURT. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's complaint without prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
September 2, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Hamal Jacob Strand.(Strand, Hamal)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Hamal Jacob Strand (Strand, Hamal)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Hamal Jacob Strand (Strand, Hamal)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: Plaintiff Hamal Jacob Strand has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Hamal Jacob Strand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TH)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson, filed by Hamal Jacob Strand. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Subpoena - Jewett, #5 Proposed Subpoena - Derksema)(GT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strand v. Jewett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellissa Derksema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Jewett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamal Jacob Strand
Represented By: Hamal Jacob Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?