Bury v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Ann Bury
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Personal Care Products Council, John Does 1-30, Unknown Businesses 1-50, Jane Does 1-30, Unknown Corporations 1-50 and Imerys Talc America Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01276
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in the District of New Jersey as case 3:19-cv-17751 on 9/9/2019. (PM)
September 3, 2019 Case sent by electronic transfer to the District of New Jersey per Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-161), Dkt. #6 . (PM)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 MDL 2738 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-161); in re Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation; Transferred to the District of New Jersey; assigned to Judge Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Email re: Conditional Transfer Order) (PM)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case: MDL 2738 In re: Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc. (PM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc, Personal Care Products Council (Attachments: #1 Summons - Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc, #2 Summons - Personal Care Products Council) (PM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) John Does/Jane Does 1-30, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc, Personal Care Products Council, Unknown Businesses and/or Corporations 1-50 with JURY DEMAND, filed by Ann Bury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12, #2 Exhibit 13-25, #3 Exhibit 26-41, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Vasquez, Jose)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc, Imerys Talc America Inc, and Personal Care Products Council. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GT)
August 15, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (GT)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5885245) Attorney Jose Dino Vasquez added to party Ann Bury(pty:pla), filed by Ann Bury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12, #2 Exhibit 13-25, #3 Exhibit 26-41, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Vasquez, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bury v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Bury
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personal Care Products Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Businesses 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Corporations 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?