Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Bianchi LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Brian Bianchi, Bianchi, LLC, Douglas Bianchi, Amber Bianchi, Bianchi LLC and "Spouse" Bianchi
Case Number: 2:2019cv01279
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Douglas Bianchi.(Appel, Daniel)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Born, Brian)
September 3, 2019 Attorney Steve Zimmerman for Douglas Bianchi added; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel J Appel on behalf of Defendant Douglas Bianchi. (Appel, Daniel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Douglas Bianchi on 8/20/2019, filed by Plaintiff Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Born, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Brian & Amber Bianchi on 8/20/2019, filed by Plaintiff Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Born, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Bianchi, LLC on 8/25/2019, filed by Plaintiff Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Born, Brian)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Bianchi LLC, Douglas Bianchi, Brian Bianchi, and Amber Bianchi. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GT)
August 15, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Born, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL defendant(s) filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Counsel Brian M Born. (Receipt #0981-5885633(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Born, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Bianchi LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bianchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bianchi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Bianchi
Represented By: Daniel J Appel
Represented By: Steve Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Bianchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bianchi LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Spouse" Bianchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian M Born
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?