Jackson et al v. The Aliera Companies Inc et al
Plaintiff: Roslyn Jackson, Gerald Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin and Julie Perrin
Defendant: The Aliera Companies, Inc., Trinity Healthshare, Inc., Aliera Healthcare, Inc., Trinity Healthshare Inc, Aliera Healthcare Inc and The Aliera Companies Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01281
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings and Any Further Discovery. Dkt. No. #66 . The Court requests that Defendants file their reply briefs by 7/31/2020. (MW)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re #91 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jay Angoff for Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, and Jon Perrin, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re #92 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Cyrus Mehri for Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, and Julie Perrin, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 22, 2020 ***Motion terminated: At the direction of chambers, Defendants' #44 MOTION to Stay Discovery is STRICKEN as moot pursuant to the Court's Order at Dkt. #47 . (LW)
July 21, 2020 Filing 92 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Cyrus Mehri FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6477621 (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 21, 2020 Filing 91 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jay Angoff FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6477613 (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #90 Order on Motion to Compel: struck through #61 link as this is still a pending motion. Order does not dispose of document #61 . (PM)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying Defendants' #52 consolidated motion to compel arbitration. Given the Court's ruling, the #61 Motion to Stay the Proceedings Pending Arbitration, and Stay Discovery Pending a Decision on the Motion to Compel Arbitration are stricken as moot. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (PM) Modified on 7/21/2020 to strike through #61 link which is still a pending motion (PM).
July 20, 2020 Filing 89 Joint Stipulated MOTION for Amended Case Scheduling Order, filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 20, 2020 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Eleanor Hamburger filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin re #66 MOTION to Stay - The Aliera Companies Inc. and Trinity Healthshare, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings and Any Further Discovery (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 20, 2020 Filing 87 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin, to #66 MOTION to Stay - The Aliera Companies Inc. and Trinity Healthshare, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings and Any Further Discovery. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 15, 2020 Filing 86 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #83 Response to Motion, Denying Defendants' Second Consolidated Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 15, 2020 Filing 85 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A-Redacted Copy of Sealed Document by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin re #82 MOTION to Seal /Redact, #84 Declaration,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-Redacted Copy of Sealed Document, #2 Exhibit A-Unredacted Sealed Document, #3 Exhibit C-Unredacted Sealed Document)(Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 15, 2020 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Eleanor Hamburger filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin re #61 MOTION to Compel -- Defendants The Aliera Companies, Inc.'s and Trinity Healthshare, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. sections 3 and 4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Placeholder-Filed under Seal, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C Placeholder-Filed under Seal)(Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 15, 2020 Filing 83 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin, to #61 MOTION to Compel -- Defendants The Aliera Companies, Inc.'s and Trinity Healthshare, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. sections 3 and 4. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 15, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION to Seal /Redact, filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re #80 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth B Shirley for Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 14, 2020 Filing 80 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth B. Shirley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. CWAWDC-6461907 (Sargent, Edgar)
July 13, 2020 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Cyrus Mehri filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin re #71 MOTION to Certify Class (Spoonemore, Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Michael David Myers filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin re #71 MOTION to Certify Class (Spoonemore, Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 77 DECLARATION of Richard E. Spoonemore filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin re #71 MOTION to Certify Class (Spoonemore, Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Julie Perrin filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin re #71 MOTION to Certify Class (Spoonemore, Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Jon Perrin filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin re #71 MOTION to Certify Class (Spoonemore, Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Dean Mellom filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin re #71 MOTION to Certify Class (Spoonemore, Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Roslyn Jackson filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin re #71 MOTION to Certify Class (Spoonemore, Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Gerald Jackson filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin re #71 MOTION to Certify Class (Spoonemore, Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin. (Spoonemore, Richard)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re #69 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert H Rutherford for Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 10, 2020 Filing 69 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert H. Rutherford FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6456216 (Sargent, Edgar)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER. ): The Court is in receipt of Defendants' second Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. sections 3 and 4. Dkt. No. #61 . The Court requests that Plaintiffs file a response brief by July 15, 2020, addressing the arguments Defendants raise with respect to the new plaintiffs. Defendants should file their reply brief no later than July 29, 2020. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #40 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
July 6, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION to Stay - The Aliera Companies Inc. and Trinity Healthshare, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings and Any Further Discovery, filed by Defendants Aliera Healthcare, Inc., The Aliera Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jolly, Richard)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER re parties' #64 Proposed Order signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
June 29, 2020 Filing 64 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER (Sargent, Edgar)
June 24, 2020 Filing 63 ANSWER to #57 Amended Complaint,, Defendant The Aliera Companies, Inc.'s, Formerly Known as Aliera Healthcare, Inc., Answer and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Aliera Healthcare, Inc., The Aliera Companies Inc.(Jolly, Richard)
June 24, 2020 Filing 62 ANSWER to #57 Amended Complaint,, by Trinity Healthshare Inc.(Hineline, Curt)
June 24, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION to Compel -- Defendants The Aliera Companies, Inc.'s and Trinity Healthshare, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. sections 3 and 4, filed by Defendants Aliera Healthcare, Inc., The Aliera Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jolly, Richard)
June 19, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of motions hearing held on 6/9/2020 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2020, (NB)
June 17, 2020 Filing 59 REPLY, filed by Defendant Trinity Healthshare Inc, TO RESPONSE to #52 MOTION to Compel The Aliera Companies, Inc.s And Trinity Healthshare Inc.s Consolidated Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay The Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 3 And 4; And Motion To Stay Discovery Pending A Deci (Hineline, Curt)
June 14, 2020 Filing 58 REPLY, filed by Defendants Aliera Healthcare, Inc., The Aliera Companies Inc, TO RESPONSE to #52 MOTION to Compel The Aliera Companies, Inc.s And Trinity Healthshare Inc.s Consolidated Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay The Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 3 And 4; And Motion To Stay Discovery Pending A Deci (Jolly, Richard)
June 10, 2020 Filing 57 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants, filed by Roslyn Jackson, Gerald Jackson, Dean Mellom, Jon Perrin, Julie Perrin. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G, #8 Appendix H, #9 Appendix I, #10 Appendix J, #11 Appendix K, #12 Appendix L, #13 Appendix M, #14 Appendix N, #15 Appendix O, #16 Appendix P, #17 Appendix Q, #18 Appendix R, #19 Appendix S, #20 Appendix T, #21 Appendix U)(Hamburger, Eleanor)
June 9, 2020 Filing 56 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein- Dep Clerk: Lowell Williams; Pla Counsel: Richard Spoonemore, Eleanor Hamburger; Def Counsel: Richard Jolley, Ronan Doherty, Edgar Sargent, Curt Hineline, Jacqueline Menk; CR: Nancy Bauer; Time of Hearing: 10:00 AM; Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 6/9/2020. Court hears argument from counsel on the pending motions. Court grants plaintiffs' motion to amend complaint and sets a deadline of 6/26/2020 for defendants to respond to plaintiffs' discovery requests. Written order to follow. (LW)
June 8, 2020 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Richard E. Spoonemore filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom re #52 MOTION to Compel The Aliera Companies, Inc.s And Trinity Healthshare Inc.s Consolidated Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay The Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 3 And 4; And Motion To Stay Discovery Pending A Deci (Spoonemore, Richard)
June 8, 2020 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Toni Hood filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom re #52 MOTION to Compel The Aliera Companies, Inc.s And Trinity Healthshare Inc.s Consolidated Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay The Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 3 And 4; And Motion To Stay Discovery Pending A Deci (Spoonemore, Richard)
June 8, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, to #52 MOTION to Compel The Aliera Companies, Inc.s And Trinity Healthshare Inc.s Consolidated Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay The Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 3 And 4; And Motion To Stay Discovery Pending A Deci. (Spoonemore, Richard)
June 5, 2020 Set Hearings: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 6/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
June 4, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION to Compel The Aliera Companies, Inc.s And Trinity Healthshare Inc.s Consolidated Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay The Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 3 And 4; And Motion To Stay Discovery Pending A Decision On The Motion To Compel Arbitration, filed by Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Compelling Arbitration And Staying The Proceedings Pending Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 3 And 4, #3 Proposed Order Staying Discovery Pending A Ruling On The Motion To Compel Arbitration And Staying Proceedings Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 3 And 4)(Wallace, Genevieve)
June 4, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Edgar Guy Sargent on behalf of Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc. (Sargent, Edgar)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re #48 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ronan Patrick Doherty for Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 3, 2020 Filing 49 PRAECIPE to attach document ECF Agreement for Ronan P. Doherty re #48 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc (Wallace, Genevieve)
June 3, 2020 Filing 48 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ronan P. Doherty FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6378676 (Wallace, Genevieve)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. #21 , #23 ). Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
May 26, 2020 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Eleanor Hamburger filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom re #40 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hamburger, Eleanor)
May 26, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, TO RESPONSE to #40 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint (Hamburger, Eleanor)
May 26, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Stay The Aliera Companies, Inc. And Trinity Healthshare, Inc.s Motion To Stay Discovery, filed by Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Genevieve)
May 11, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE, by Defendants The Aliera Companies Inc, Trinity Healthshare Inc, to #40 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint. (Morrison, James)
April 23, 2020 Filing 42 PRAECIPE re #40 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom (Attachments: #1 [Revised] Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Hamburger, Eleanor)
April 20, 2020 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Eleanor Hamburger filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom re #40 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint (Hamburger, Eleanor)
April 20, 2020 Filing 40 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Second (redline), #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C, #5 Appendix D, #6 Appendix E, #7 Appendix F, #8 Appendix G, #9 Appendix H, #10 Appendix I, #11 Appendix J, #12 Appendix K, #13 Appendix L, #14 Appendix M, #15 Appendix N, #16 Appendix O, #17 Appendix P, #18 Appendix Q, #19 Appendix R, #20 Appendix S, #21 Appendix T, #22 Appendix U, #23 Proposed Order)(Hamburger, Eleanor)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re Parties' #38 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
March 4, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER [Model Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order by parties (Hamburger, Eleanor)
February 26, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, TO RESPONSE to #34 MOTION Renewed Motion to Supplement the Record and for Judicial Notice re #27 Response to Motion to Dismiss (Spoonemore, Richard)
February 12, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE, by Defendants Aliera Healthcare Inc, The Aliera Companies Inc, Trinity Healthshare Inc, to #34 MOTION Renewed Motion to Supplement the Record and for Judicial Notice re #27 Response to Motion to Dismiss. (Wallace, Genevieve)
January 22, 2020 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Richard E. Spoonemore filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom re #34 MOTION Renewed Motion to Supplement the Record and for Judicial Notice re #27 Response to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Spoonemore, Richard)
January 22, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION Renewed Motion to Supplement the Record and for Judicial Notice re #27 Response to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spoonemore, Richard)
January 21, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #31 MOTION to Supplement the Record and for Judicial Notice re #27 Response to Motion to Dismiss ; by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom. (Spoonemore, Richard)
January 16, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Richard E. Spoonemore filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom re #31 MOTION to Supplement the Record and for Judicial Notice re #27 Response to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Spoonemore, Richard)
January 16, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Supplement the Record and for Judicial Notice re #27 Response to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spoonemore, Richard)
December 6, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY, filed by Defendant Trinity Healthshare Inc, TO RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Dismiss (Morrison, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY, filed by Defendants Aliera Healthcare Inc, The Aliera Companies Inc, TO RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Dismiss THE ALIERA COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Wallace, Genevieve)
November 22, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Richard E. Spoonemore in Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom re #21 MOTION to Dismiss , #23 MOTION to Dismiss THE ALIERA COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, pp. 4-26, #2 Exhibit B, pp. 27-28)(Spoonemore, Richard)
November 22, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom, to #21 MOTION to Dismiss , #23 MOTION to Dismiss THE ALIERA COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. (Spoonemore, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard L Jolly for Aliera Healthcare Inc Defendant The Aliera Companies, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Modified on 11/5/2019 (DS).
November 5, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard L. Jolly FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5995835 (Wallace, Genevieve)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Standing Order for Civil Cases (Standing Order) [Dkt. No. 10], the Court HEREBY STRIKES the noting date for the motion to dismiss [Dkt. No. 23]. Instead, pursuant to Section II.A. 3 of the Standing Order, the opposition to the motion is due twenty-one (21) days after the date on which the motion was filed and the reply is due fourteen (14) days after the opposition is filed. This Minute Order does not strike the motion; rather, it strikes the noting date. The Court will consider the motion upon the completion of briefing in accordance with the foregoing schedule. In the future, the Court expects the parties to comply with the terms of the Standing Order. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
November 1, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss THE ALIERA COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS, filed by Defendants Aliera Healthcare Inc, The Aliera Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal) (Wallace, Genevieve)
November 1, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of James R. Morrison in Support of Defendant Trinity Healthshare, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Trinity Healthshare Inc re #21 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Morrison, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Trinity Healthshare Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morrison, James)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: The trial scheduled for 2/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16106 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein is rescheduled as a JURY TRIAL. All other dates and deadlines remain as set. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom (Spoonemore, Richard)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 8 DAY - Bench Trial is set for 2/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16106 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Joinder of Parties due by 11/20/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/13/2020, Discovery completed by 8/12/2020, Dispositive motions due by 9/11/2020, Motions in Limine due by 1/4/2021, Joint Pretrial Statement due by 1/11/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 16106 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 8. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT [FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT] against defendant(s) Aliera Healthcare Inc, The Aliera Companies Inc, Trinity Healthshare Inc, filed by Roslyn Jackson, Gerald Jackson, Dean Mellom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appendix A, #2 Exhibit Appendix B, #3 Exhibit Appendix C, #4 Exhibit Appendix D, #5 Exhibit Appendix E, #6 Exhibit Appendix F, #7 Exhibit Appendix G, #8 Exhibit Appendix H, #9 Exhibit Appendix I, #10 Exhibit Appendix J, #11 Exhibit Appendix K, #12 Exhibit Appendix L, #13 Exhibit Appendix M)(Spoonemore, Richard)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint re parties' #14 Stipulated Motion. Defendants' response is due October 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, , filed by Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc. Noting Date 9/9/2019, (Wallace, Genevieve)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Aliera Companies Inc (Wallace, Genevieve)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Genevieve Vose Wallace on behalf of Defendant The Aliera Companies Inc. (Wallace, Genevieve)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Trinity Healthshare Inc (Hineline, Curt)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/7/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/15/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Raymond Morrison on behalf of Defendant Trinity Healthshare Inc. (Morrison, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Curt Roy Hineline on behalf of Defendant Trinity Healthshare Inc. (Hineline, Curt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Aliera Healthcare, Inc. on 8/28/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Trinity Healthshare, Inc. on 8/20/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Aliera Companies, Inc. on 8/20/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Samantha Lin on behalf of Plaintiffs Gerald Jackson, Roslyn Jackson, Dean Mellom. (Lin, Samantha)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Aliera Healthcare Inc, The Aliera Companies Inc, and Trinity Healthshare Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT)
August 15, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5885760) Attorney Eleanor Hamburger added to party Gerald Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Eleanor Hamburger added to party Roslyn Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Eleanor Hamburger added to party Dean Mellom(pty:pla), filed by Roslyn Jackson, Gerald Jackson, Dean Mellom. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G, #8 Appendix H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons to The Aliera Companies, Inc., #11 Summons to Aliera Healthcare, Inc., #12 Summons to Trinity Healthshare, Inc.)(Hamburger, Eleanor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. The Aliera Companies Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roslyn Jackson
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: Richard E Spoonemore
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Represented By: Samantha Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Jackson
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: Richard E Spoonemore
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Represented By: Samantha Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Mellom
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: Richard E Spoonemore
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Represented By: Samantha Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Perrin
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: Richard E Spoonemore
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Represented By: Samantha Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Perrin
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: Richard E Spoonemore
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Represented By: Samantha Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Aliera Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Healthshare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliera Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L Jolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Healthshare Inc
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: James Raymond Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliera Healthcare Inc
Represented By: Genevieve Vose Wallace
Represented By: Edgar Guy Sargent
Represented By: Robert H Rutherford
Represented By: Elizabeth B Shirley
Represented By: Richard L Jolly
Represented By: Ronan Patrick Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Aliera Companies Inc
Represented By: Genevieve Vose Wallace
Represented By: Edgar Guy Sargent
Represented By: Robert H Rutherford
Represented By: Elizabeth B Shirley
Represented By: Richard L Jolly
Represented By: Ronan Patrick Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?