United States of America v. Tacker et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC, William A. Tacker, Jr., State of Washington, King County, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Jami L. Tacker, CACH, LLC, Equable Ascent Financial, LLC, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Beneficial Washington, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., Accounts Receivable, Inc., American General Financial Services, Inc., Bank of America NA, Cach LLC, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, William A Tacker, Jr, Midland Funding LLC, Beneficial Washington Inc, Accounts Receivable Inc, American General Financial Services Inc, Equable Ascent Financial LLC and Jami L Tacker
Case Number: 2:2019cv01285
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #21 Summons Returned Executed, #22 Summons Returned Executed, #23 Summons Returned Executed (Valdman, Rika)
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 10/1/2019 (Valdman, Rika)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant American General Financial Services Inc on 10/1/2019 (Valdman, Rika)
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Bank of America NA on 10/3/2019 (Valdman, Rika)
October 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per telephonic request, the deadline for a Rule 26(f) conference is EXTENDED to December 16, 2019, and the deadlines for initial disclosures and submission of a Joint Status Report are EXTENDED to December 30, 2019. (KD)
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by King County.(Atchison, Jennifer)
September 30, 2019 Attorney Margaret A Pahl for King County added; per #19 Praecipe to Attach Document. (SWT)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 PRAECIPE to attach document (Signature Page) re #9 Notice of Appearance by Defendant King County (Atchison, Jennifer)
September 27, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #15 Praecipe-Other : Modified docket text to indicate SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Midland Funding, LLC on 8/28/2019 (SWT)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #17 Summons Returned Executed, #13 Summons Returned Executed, #12 Summons Returned Executed, #14 Summons Returned Executed, #10 Summons Returned Executed, #15 Praecipe-Other, #16 Summons Returned Executed, #11 Summons Returned Executed (Valdman, Rika)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant State of Washington on 9/11/2019 (Valdman, Rika)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Select Portfolio Servicing Inc on 9/4/2019 (Valdman, Rika)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 PRAECIPE to Service of Summons re #15 ; SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Midland Funding, LLC on 8/28/2019 by Plaintiff United States of America (Valdman, Rika) Modified docket text on 9/30/2019 (SWT).
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Midland Funding LLC on 8/28/2019 (Valdman, Rika)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant King County on 9/18/2019 (Valdman, Rika)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Equable Ascent Financial LLC on 9/3/2019 (Valdman, Rika)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Cach LLC on 8/29/2019 (Valdman, Rika)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Accounts Receivable Inc on 8/27/2019 (Valdman, Rika)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #9 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Margaret Pahl. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SWT)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer H Atchison on behalf of Defendant King County. (Atchison, Jennifer)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp. for Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc (Hovda, KC)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KC Lynne Hovda on behalf of Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Hovda, KC)
September 20, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #6 Answer to Complaint was improperly signed by KC Hovda. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SWT)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.(Courser, Donald)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #5 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by KC Hovda. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SWT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donald Jeffrey Courser on behalf of Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Courser, Donald)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian K Gerst on behalf of Defendant Accounts Receivable Inc. (Gerst, Brian)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/29/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/29/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(GT)
August 16, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Rika Valdman added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons William A. Tacker, Jr., #3 Summons Jami L.Tacker, #4 Summons American General Financial Services, Inc., #5 Summons Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, #6 Summons Accounts Receivable, Inc., #7 Summons Equable Ascent Financial, LLC, #8 Summons CACH, LLC, #9 Summons Midland Funding, LLC, #10 Summons Beneficial Washington, Inc., #11 Summons Bank of America, N.A., #12 Summons Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., #13 Summons State of Washington, #14 Summons King County)(Valdman, Rika) (No Fee Required)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Tacker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Tacker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Margaret A Pahl
Represented By: Jennifer H Atchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jami L. Tacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equable Ascent Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneficial Washington, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accounts Receivable, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cach LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: KC Lynne Hovda
Represented By: Donald Jeffrey Courser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A Tacker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneficial Washington Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accounts Receivable Inc
Represented By: Brian K Gerst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Financial Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equable Ascent Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jami L Tacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?