Silva v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Ramon Saul Silva
Defendant: Barrett Horn, Jason Edmond, Cameron Walker and Daniel Molina
Case Number: 2:2019cv01294
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER of Service of Cameron Walker by Defendants Jason Edmond, Barrett Horn, Daniel Molina, Cameron Walker (Summers, Ann)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER of Service of Daniel Molina by Defendants Jason Edmond, Barrett Horn, Daniel Molina, Cameron Walker (Summers, Ann)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 Mail addressed to Officer Barrett Horn returned as Undeliverable re #6 Order Directing Service (SWT)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ann Marie Summers on behalf of Defendants Jason Edmond, Barrett Horn, Daniel Molina, Cameron Walker. (Summers, Ann)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Served by 1st Class Mail to Cameron Walker; Jason Edmond; Daniel Molina; Barrett Horn on 9/5/2019. (cc: plaintiff; King County Prosecuting Attorney's Office)(ST)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Ramon Saul Silva against defendant(s) Jason Edmond, Barrett Horn, Daniel Molina, Cameron Walker with JURY DEMAND (ST)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (cc: plaintiff; King County Jail via USPS)(ST)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Ramon Saul Silva. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Horn
Represented By: Ann Marie Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Edmond
Represented By: Ann Marie Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Walker
Represented By: Ann Marie Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Molina
Represented By: Ann Marie Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Saul Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?