Lewis v. United States Western District Court at Seattle et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Eugene Lewis
Defendant: King County, King County Judicial Administration, City of Seattle, Harborview Hospital, Walmart and United States Western District Court at Seattle
Case Number: 2:2019cv01295
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (ST)
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 ADDITIONAL FACTS re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED Motion to Stop Western State Hospital from Unlawfully Withdrawing Blood filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
September 27, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED Motion to Add Additional Claims re #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (ST)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED Motion to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (SG) Modified on 9/30/2019 to reflect correct filing date(MET).
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED Motion to Show Cause - Hearing on Placement filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (SG)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED Emergency Motion to Add Additional Claims filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (SG)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED Additional Claim re Involuntary Forced Medication re #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (ST)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED Motion for Emergency Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction re #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (ST)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief re #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (ST)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED Motion to Add Additional Claim re #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (ST)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #11 Proposed Document(s) filed by Anthony Eugene Lewis, #6 Proposed Document(s) filed by Anthony Eugene Lewis, #7 Proposed Document(s) filed by Anthony Eugene Lewis, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Anthony Eugene Lewis, #10 Proposed Document(s) filed by Anthony Eugene Lewis, #8 Proposed Document(s) filed by Anthony Eugene Lewis. Objections to R&R due by 10/11/2019, Noting Date 10/18/2019. A copy of this R&R has been mailed to plaintiff on 09/20/19. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order, #2 R&R Proposed Judgment)(GB)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED Motion to Add Another Claim filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis re #1 Complaint (ST)
September 19, 2019 NOTICE of Change of Address per #9 Additional Claim filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (docket updated per direction of pro se law clerk)(ST)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 ADDITIONAL Claim and Evidence and as a Declaration In Support of #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Emergency Motion for Release and Discharge filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED Motion to Add Claims and Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (SG)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Counsel, for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (SG)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Supplement to Proposed Complaint, by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis (SG)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name Filed by Plaintiff Anthony Eugene Lewis. (clerk updated docket at case opening)(SG)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Anthony Eugene Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement, #3 Proposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Proposed Motion Why Plaintiff May Proceed by Informa Pauperis)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. United States Western District Court at Seattle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Judicial Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harborview Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Western District Court at Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Eugene Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?