Nair et al v. Copeland et al
Plaintiff: Jayakumar A Nair, Sukanya Susheel, Jayakrishnan K Nair and Rajakumari Susheelkumar
Defendant: John Doe 1, John Doe, 2, Jane Doe 3, Tedlaw, Channa Copeland, Harborview Medical Center, Masumi, Roger, Andrew Han, Department of Social & Health Services, Molina Healthcare Inc, City of Snoqualmie, Randy Wilson, John Doe 2 and Andrew Hahn
Case Number: 2:2019cv01296
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by Defendant Channa Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/25/2019, (Young, Saphronia)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #26 Motion for Reconsideration and denying Plaintiffs' #8 Petition to Terminate Guardianship, Reinstate Insurance Nunc Pro Tunc, and Return Marshalled Assets. The Order of Dismissal previously entered is withdrawn and the case is reopened. Plaintiffs are directed to serve the remainder of the Defendants in this matter. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH) (cc: Plaintiffs Jayakumar A Nair, Rajakumari Susheelkumar, Sukanya Susheel via USPS)
September 30, 2019 Filing 28 Second DECLARATION of Jayakrishnan K. Nair (Supplement to the Motion for Reconsideration) filed by Plaintiff Jayakrishnan K Nair re #26 MOTION for Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CMS SFF List, Ashley's Statement, Dr. Nayak's Report, Jay's Email to Cop)(Nair, Jayakrishnan) Modified on 9/30/2019 to add this is a suppl. to the motion for reconsideration (PM).
September 25, 2019 Noting Date Set re Plaintiff's #26 MOTION for Reconsideration : Noting Date 9/24/2019. (PM)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Plaintiff's #26 MOTION to Set Aside, or Correct Sentence: corrected title of document to Motion for Reconsideration. (PM)
September 25, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Jayakrishnan K. Nair filed by Plaintiff Jayakrishnan K Nair in support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #26 Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit McBroom Email about Commissioner Judson)(Nair, Jayakrishnan) Modified on 9/25/2019: to correct document link and language to #26 Motion for Reconsideration (PM).
September 24, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Reconsideration to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255), ., filed by Jayakrishnan K Nair. (Attachments: #1 Molina Insurance Benefits: Bad Faith, #2 Molina Card)(Nair, Jayakrishnan) Modified on 9/25/2019 to correct title of document (PM).
September 24, 2019 Filing 25 JUDGMENT BY COURT. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice sua sponte on the grounds that there is no subject matter jurisdiction in the matter. (PM) cc: Plaintiffs Jayakumar A Nair, Rajakumari Susheelkumar and Sukanya Susheel via first class mail
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER dismissing matter with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: Plaintiffs Jayakumar A. Nair, R. Susheelkumar and S. Sushell via first class mail
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Plaintiffs are ordered to cease filing motions until further order of the Court, and Defendants are not required to respond any further to Plaintiffs' motions (specifically, the motion for sanctions) until the Court has ruled on what is pending before it (the Petition to Terminate Guardianship) and considered the jurisdictional issue fully. (SWT)(cc: Plaintiffs Jayakumar Nair, Rajakumari Susheelkumar, Sukanya Susheel via USPS)
September 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Sanctions , filed by Plaintiff Jayakrishnan K Nair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 Exhibits Ex 201 - 211) Noting Date 9/27/2019, (Nair, Jayakrishnan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Jayakrishnan K. Nair filed by Plaintiff Jayakrishnan K Nair re #8 MOTION Petition to Terminate Guardianship (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photos of burnt hand, #2 Exhibit Photos of customized home, #3 Exhibit Photos of Omana before guardianship, #4 Exhibit Photos of neglect at Paramount)(Nair, Jayakrishnan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Rajakumari Susheelkumar, Sukanya Susheel and Jayakumar Nair filed by Plaintiffs Jayakumar A Nair, Sukanya Susheel, Rajakumari Susheelkumar re #8 MOTION Petition to Terminate Guardianship (Nair, Jayakrishnan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jayakrishnan K Nair, Jayakumar A Nair, Sukanya Susheel, Rajakumari Susheelkumar, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION Petition to Terminate Guardianship (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Nair, Jayakrishnan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jayakrishnan K Nair, Jayakumar A Nair, Sukanya Susheel, Rajakumari Susheelkumar, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION Petition to Terminate Guardianship (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of family members, #2 Exhibit 12 Exhibits)(Nair, Jayakrishnan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE, by Defendant Channa Copeland, to #8 MOTION Petition to Terminate Guardianship. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Young, Saphronia)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's #11 Second Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs Jayakumar Nair, Rajakumari Susheelkumar, Sukanya Susheel via USPS)
September 6, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #14 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint: corrected date of service from 8/22/2019 to 8/21/2019 #12 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint : corrected date of service from 8/27/2019 to 8/26/2019, (PM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dr. Andrew Hahn on 8/26/2019, filed by Plaintiff Jayakrishnan K Nair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit King County Sheriffs Office)(Nair, Jayakrishnan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Channa Copeland on 8/22/2019 8/21/2019, filed by Plaintiff Jayakrishnan K Nair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pierce County Sheriffs Office)(Nair, Jayakrishnan) Modified on 9/6/2019 to correct date of service (PM).
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Harborview Medical Center on 8/20/2019, filed by Plaintiff Jayakrishnan K Nair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit King County Sheriffs Office)(Nair, Jayakrishnan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dr. Andrew Hahn on 8/27/2019 8/26/2019, filed by Plaintiff Jayakrishnan K Nair. (Nair, Jayakrishnan) Modified on 9/6/2019 to correct date of service (PM).
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Jayakrishnan K Nair. (Attachments: #1 Five Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/6/2019, (Nair, Jayakrishnan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian P. Waters on behalf of Defendants Andrew Hahn, Harborview Medical Center. (Waters, Brian)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Saphronia R Young on behalf of Defendant Channa Copeland. (Young, Saphronia)
September 3, 2019 Noting Date Reset re #8 MOTION Petition to Terminate Guardianship : Noting Date 9/13/2019, per LCR 7(d) and per direction of chambers. (PM)
September 3, 2019 ***Motion terminated: #7 MOTION Petition to Terminate Guardianship filed by Jayakrishnan K Nair, Jayakumar A Nair, Sukanya Susheel, Rajakumari Susheelkumar. Motion refiled as Dkt. #8 which remains pending. (PM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Petition to Terminate Guardianship, filed by Plaintiffs Jayakrishnan K Nair, Jayakumar A Nair, Sukanya Susheel, Rajakumari Susheelkumar. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) Noting Date 9/6/2019, (Nair, Jayakrishnan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Petition to Terminate Guardianship, filed by Plaintiffs Jayakrishnan K Nair, Jayakumar A Nair, Sukanya Susheel, Rajakumari Susheelkumar. Noting Date 9/6/2019, (Nair, Jayakrishnan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE: Plaintiff Jayakrishnan K Nair has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (STP)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #4 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Once Defendants have been served and appeared, the parties are ordered to meet, confer, and propose a briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' request for injunctive relief. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: Plaintiffs via first class mail
August 20, 2019 ***Motion terminated: #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Jayakrishnan K Nair, Jayakumar A Nair, Sukanya Susheel, Rajakumari Susheelkumar, per payment of filing fee on 8/19/2019 and per direction of chambers. (PM)
August 19, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re EXHIBITS to #4 Complaint and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that are required to be redacted per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2, and has been administratively sealed. Please file a redacted version of the document as soon as practicable. This will not affect your original filing date. (PM) cc: NEF sent to Plaintiffs via first class mail
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Jury Trial Requested, filed by Plaintiffs Jayakrishnan K Nair, Jayakumar A Nair, Sukanya Susheel, Rajakumari Susheelkumar. (fee paid) (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibits A-D13, #2 SEALED Exhibits D13-D48, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) Noting Date 8/19/2019, (PM) Clerk sealed Attachments #1 & #2 due to sensitive personal identifiers
August 19, 2019 Summonses Issued in Paper Form as to defendants City of Snoqualmie, Channa Copeland, Department of Social & Health Services, John Doe, 2, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 3, Andrew Han, Harborview Medical Center, Molina Healthcare Inc, and Randy Wilson. (GT)
August 19, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number SEA097413. (GT)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Plaintiff's Jayakrishnan K Nair's #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 9/2/2019, Noting Date 9/2/2019. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order) (PM) cc: Plaintiffs via first class mail
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Peterson, filed by Rajakumari Susheelkumar, Jayakumar A Nair, Jayakrishnan K Nair, Sukanya Susheel. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 SEALED Exhibits A-D13, #3 SEALED Exhibits D13-D48, #4 Proposed Order - TRO, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (PM) Clerk sealed Attachments #2 & #3 due to sensitive personal identifiers.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nair et al v. Copeland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tedlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channa Copeland
Represented By: Saphronia R Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harborview Medical Center
Represented By: Brian P. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masumi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Social & Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molina Healthcare Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Snoqualmie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hahn
Represented By: Brian P. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayakumar A Nair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sukanya Susheel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayakrishnan K Nair
Represented By: Jayakrishnan K Nair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajakumari Susheelkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?