Center for Biological Diversity et al v. National Marine Fisheries Service et al
Plaintiff: Orca Relief Citizens Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity and Orca Relief Citizens' Alliance
Defendant: Wilbur Ross, National Marine Fisheries Service and Barry Thom
Case Number: 2:2019cv01299
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney, Western District of Washington, NMFS, Wilbur Ross (Secretary of Commerce), and Barry Thom (NMFS Regional Administrator) on 8/22/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Orca Relief Citizens' Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Receipts & Delivery Confirmation)(Simmonds, Julie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants National Marine Fisheries Service, Barry Thom, and Wilbur Ross. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(GT)
August 20, 2019 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (GT)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Catherine Kilduff for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity and Orca Relief Citizens Alliance, by Judge Walter T. McGovern,Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Modified on 8/20/2019 (KB).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Julie Teel Simmonds for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity and Orca Relief Citizens Alliance, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Catherine Kilduff FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Orca Relief Citizens Alliance (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5890461 (Ressler, Sophia)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Julie Teel Simmonds FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Orca Relief Citizens Alliance (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5890447 (Ressler, Sophia)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Orca Relief Citizens Alliance (Ressler, Sophia)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) National Marine Fisheries Service, Wilbur Ross, Barry Thom (Receipt # 0981-5889988) Attorney Sophia N. Ressler added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:pla), Attorney Sophia N. Ressler added to party Orca Relief Citizens Alliance(pty:pla), filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Orca Relief Citizens Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to National Marine Fisheries Service, #3 Summons to Barry Thom, #4 Summons to Wilbur Ross, #5 Summons to U.S. Attorney, #6 Summons to U.S. Attorney General)(Ressler, Sophia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. National Marine Fisheries Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Thom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orca Relief Citizens Alliance
Represented By: Julie Teel Simmonds
Represented By: Catherine Kilduff
Represented By: Sophia N. Ressler
Represented By: Sarah Uhlemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Julie Teel Simmonds
Represented By: Catherine Kilduff
Represented By: Sophia N. Ressler
Represented By: Sarah Uhlemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orca Relief Citizens' Alliance
Represented By: Julie Teel Simmonds
Represented By: Catherine Kilduff
Represented By: Sophia N. Ressler
Represented By: Sarah Uhlemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?