Most Wanted Motorsports LLC v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Most Wanted Motorsports LLC
Defendant: Paige A Thompson, Amazon Web Services, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, Amazon Web Services Inc and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv01303
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Case sent to the Eastern District of Virginia by electronic case. (PM)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 MDL 2915 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1); In re Capital One Consumer Data Security Breach Litigation; Eastern District of Virginia; assigned to Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (PM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Conditional Transfer Order ; filed by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1))(Hade, Kellen)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Present before the Court is a joint motion to stay. #11 . The motion asks the Court to stay these proceedings pending resolution of the motions to transfer and consolidate related cases before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML). The JPML will hear oral argument on the Section 1407 motions on September 26, 2019. The Court finds good cause to grant the motion. Therefore, it is ordered that this action is STAYED. Counsel will submit a joint status report on or before October 31, 2019 addressing the posture of the case in light of the JPML proceedings. So ordered and authorized by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein on September 12, 2019. (RM)
September 12, 2019 Attorneys Steven A Miller and Daniel J. Oates added for Capital One Financial Corporation per #9 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
September 12, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #8 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint on Paige A. Thompson: corrected date of service from 9/5/2019 to 9/4/2019. (PM)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. Noting Date 9/20/2019, (Hade, Kellen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Capital One Financial Corporation (Hade, Kellen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kellen Andrew Hade on behalf of Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Hade, Kellen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Paige A Thompson on 9/5/2019 9/4/2019 , filed by Plaintiff Most Wanted Motorsports LLC. (Laufenberg, Cari) Modified on 9/12/2019: corrected date of service (PM).
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Capital One Financial Corporation mailed on 8/30/2019 (Laufenberg, Cari)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Amazon Web Services Inc on 8/28/2019 (Laufenberg, Cari)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Most Wanted Motorsports LLC (Laufenberg, Cari)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 4 Order of Recusal: The correct case number for all documents filed in this case is 2:19-cv-1303-BJR (TW)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke recused. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. All future documents filed in this case must bear the cause number 2:19-cv-01303-BJR and bear the Judge's name in the upper right hand corner of the document. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, at the direction of Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) Modified on 8/22/2019 (TW).
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Capital One Financial Corporation, Amazon Web Services Inc, and Paige A Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Most Wanted Motorsports LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/27/2019. (GT)
August 20, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (GT)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-mj-00344-MAT-1; 2:19-cv-01189-BJR; 2:19-cv-01203-MAT; 2:19-cv-01218-RSM; 2:19-cv-01223-MLP, by Plaintiff Most Wanted Motorsports LLC. (Laufenberg, Cari)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon Web Services, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, Paige A Thompson with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5891021) Attorney Cari Campen Laufenberg added to party Most Wanted Motorsports LLC(pty:pla), filed by Most Wanted Motorsports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Amazon Web Services, Inc., #3 Summons Capital One Financial Corporation, #4 Summons Paige A. Thompson)(Laufenberg, Cari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Most Wanted Motorsports LLC v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Steven A Miller
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Most Wanted Motorsports LLC
Represented By: Cari Campen Laufenberg
Represented By: T David Copley
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?