Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington et al v. Spectrum Specialty Builders Inc et al
Plaintiff: Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Washington-Idaho, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington and Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington
Defendant: Spectrum Specialty Builders Inc and Daniel Pridemore
Case Number: 2:2019cv01306
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Spectrum Specialty Builders Inc. and Daniel Pridemore. Plaintiffs' #7 MOTION for Default against Defendants Spectrum Specialty Builders, Inc. and Daniel Pridemore is granted. (VE)
September 14, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Maxwell filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Washington-Idaho, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington re #7 MOTION for Default against Defendants Spectrum Specialty Builders, Inc. and Daniel Pridemore (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default against Defendants Spectrum Specialty Builders, Inc. and Daniel Pridemore, filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Washington-Idaho, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/16/2019, (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Daniel Pridemore on 8/22/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Washington-Idaho, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington. (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Spectrum Specialty Builders Inc via Daniel Pridemore, its registered agent on 8/22/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Washington-Idaho, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington. (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Washington-Idaho, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Daniel Pridemore, Spectrum Specialty Builders Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
August 20, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY DAMAGES AND FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5891473) Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Washington-Idaho(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), filed by Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Washington-Idaho, Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Spectrum Specialty Builders Inc, #3 Summons to Daniel Pridemore)(Maxwell, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington et al v. Spectrum Specialty Builders Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund of Washington-Idaho
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Specialty Builders Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Pridemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?