Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust et al v. RG Construction Inc
Plaintiff: Washington and Northern Idaho and its Affiliated Local Unions, Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust and Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers
Defendant: RG Construction, Inc. and RG Construction Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01321
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/17/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/24/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney C Scott Kee on behalf of Defendant RG Construction Inc. (Kee, C)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust (Stoll, Mary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) RG Construction Inc (SNP)
August 23, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/30/2019 (if applicable). (SNP)
August 23, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF COLLECTIVE BARGAINING AGREEMENT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5896543) Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Washington and Northern Idaho and its Affiliated Local Unions(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust(pty:pla), filed by Washington and Northern Idaho and its Affiliated Local Unions, Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Letter requesting assignment to Seattle, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit A--Labor Agreement, #5 Exhibit B--Trust Agreement Excerpts)(Stoll, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust et al v. RG Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington and Northern Idaho and its Affiliated Local Unions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RG Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RG Construction Inc
Represented By: C Scott Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?