First Bank & Trust v. Complete Communications Inc et al
Plaintiff: First Bank & Trust
Defendant: Complete Communications Inc, James Garrett Connor and Sarah Beth Connor
Case Number: 2:2019cv01325
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 28 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of South Dakota and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
August 22, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
August 22, 2019 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of South Dakota, Case Number 4:18-cv-04123.
August 20, 2019 Filing 26 Memorandum Opinion and ORDER Transferring case to the Western District of Washington. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/20/19. (SLW) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Motion Response re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Reply Brief to Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jencks, David) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition) filed by All Defendants. (Westergaard, Terry) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jencks, David) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry G. Westergaard on behalf of All Defendants. (Westergaard, Terry) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct. Firstline shall file a brief addressing public interests that could defeat enforcement of the forum selection clause; That Defendants may file a response within 10 days after receipt of Firstline's biref; and That Firstline may file a reply brief within 5 days after receipt of Defendants' response. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 6/24/2019. (MWT) (Main Document 21 replaced due to missing page 3 on 6/25/2019. Document regenerated to counsel) (SLW). [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 20 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2019 Motions due by 8/1/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Court Trial set for 10/29/2019 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/28/2019. (SLT) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
December 3, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #19 Discovery Report was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Tronnes, Benjamin) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 (FILED IN ERROR) Discovery Report Initial Disclosures by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor.(Tronnes, Benjamin) Modified on 12/4/2018 (SAC). [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Affidavit of David J. Jencks filed by First Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Receipt, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Receipt, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Receipt) (Jencks, David) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 Discovery Report (Rule 26(f) Report) by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor.(Tronnes, Benjamin) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Receipt) (Jencks, David) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Sarah Elizabeth Conner in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 10/22/2018 (SAC). [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase and Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Conner Guarantee, #3 Exhibit 3 - 5/11/17 Correspondence from DB Squared to Def, #4 Exhibit 4 - 5/11/17 Email from Firstline to Def, #5 Exhibit 5 - Addendum Purchase/Sale Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons, #7 Exhibit 7 - Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Email string between attorneys, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Attorney Tronnes to Attorney Jencks, #10 Exhibit 10 - Email from Attorney Jencks to Attorney Tronnes) (Tronnes, Benjamin) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor. (Tronnes, Benjamin) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel from Judge Piersol)(JLS) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Complete Communications, Inc.. (Tronnes, Benjamin) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing Fee Received from Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2883163. (SLW) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLW) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor from Minnehaha County, case number 49CIV18-002622. Filed in shell case on 9/24/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Minnehaha County Summons, #2 Exhibit B- Minnehaha County Complaint)(SLW) [Transferred from sdd on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Bank & Trust v. Complete Communications Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Bank & Trust
Represented By: David J. Jencks
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Communications Inc
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Benjamin D. Tronnes
Represented By: Terry G. Westergaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Garrett Connor
Represented By: Benjamin D. Tronnes
Represented By: Terry G. Westergaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Beth Connor
Represented By: Benjamin D. Tronnes
Represented By: Terry G. Westergaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?