United States of America v. $603,840 in US Funds Seized from First Republic Bank Account No ***-****-8261 and Any Accrued Interest
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $603,840 in U.S. Funds Seized from First Republic Bank Account No. ***-****-8261, and Any Accrued Interest and $603,840 in US Funds Seized From First Republic Bank Account No ***-****-8261 and Any Accrued Interest
Case Number: 2:2019cv01375
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Publication by Plaintiff United States of America (Jensen, Michelle)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez for all further proceedings. Judge Richard A. Jones no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW) (MW).
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Warrant of Arrest In Rem Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) $603,840 in US Funds Seized From First Republic Bank Account No --8261 and Any Accrued Interest (MW)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 30, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) CR19-001-RSM (United States v. Keenan A. Gracey), by Plaintiff United States of America. (Jensen, Michelle)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Jensen, Michelle)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem against defendant(s) $603,840 in U.S. Funds Seized from First Republic Bank Account No. --8261, and Any Accrued Interest, filed by United States of America.(Jensen, Michelle) (No Fee Required) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/30/2019) (GT). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant of Arrest In Rem) (GT). Modified on 8/30/2019 to separate documents that were filed as one .pdf document (GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $603,840 in US Funds Seized from First Republic Bank Account No ***-****-8261 and Any Accrued Interest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $603,840 in U.S. Funds Seized from First Republic Bank Account No. ***-****-8261, and Any Accrued Interest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $603,840 in US Funds Seized From First Republic Bank Account No ***-****-8261 and Any Accrued Interest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?