Brown v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Plaintiff: Rodney Ricardo Brown
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
3Rd Party Defendant: Pamela Cremieux, Mario A Roberson, William Michael Brown and Dorothy P Brown
Case Number: 2:2019cv01377
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , filed by Plaintiff Rodney Ricardo Brown, Counter Defendant Rodney Ricardo Brown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order in PDF format) Noting Date 10/25/2019, (Safren, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 Plaintiff Rodney Brown's ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Third-Party Complaint for Interpleader by Rodney Ricardo Brown.(Safren, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Mario A Roberson mailed on 9/6/2019 (Bass, Katie)
September 27, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #17 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint, : Docket struck per counsel, will file corrected event. (STP)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on William Michael Brown on 9/20/2019, filed by Counter Claimant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, ThirdParty Plaintiff JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Bass, Katie)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dorothy Brown on 9/20/2019, filed by Counter Claimant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, ThirdParty Plaintiff JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Bass, Katie)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on William Michael Brown on 9/20/2019, filed by ThirdParty Defendant William Michael Brown. (Bass, Katie) Per counsel, filed incorrectly, counsel will re-file correct Affidavit of service of summons. Modified on 9/27/2019 (STP).
September 24, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #14 , #15 , #16 Notices of Appearance was improperly signed by Blair Russ. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SWT)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael S Safren on behalf of Plaintiff Rodney Ricardo Brown. (Safren, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael S Safren on behalf of Plaintiff Rodney Ricardo Brown. (Safren, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael S Safren on behalf of Plaintiff Rodney Ricardo Brown. (Safren, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Pamela Cremieux mailed on 9/10/2019 (Bass, Katie)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 12/17/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Counter Claimant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, ThirdParty Plaintiff JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA (Bass, Katie)
September 6, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 Summons Issued (Attachment #3): corrected name of person on summons from Dorothy P. Brown to William Michael Brown. Clerk inadvertently issued duplicate summons for William Brown. Clerk issued third party summons for Dorothy P. Brown, Dkt. #9 . (PM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Third Party Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Dorothy P Brown. (PM) Modified on 9/6/2019 to identify as third party summons(PM).
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA (Bass, Katie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Third Party Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mario A Roberson (Main Document), William Michael Brown, Pamela Cremieux, Dorothy P Brown (Attachments: #1 Third Party Summons Issued as to William Michael Brown, #2 Third Party Summons Issued as to Pamela Cremieux, #3 Third Party Summons Issued as to Dorothy P Brown William Michael Brown ) (TH) Modified on 9/6/2019 to correct name of person on summons - Attachment #3, per phone call from counsel. Clerk issued summons for Dorothy P. Brown, Dkt. #9 (PM).
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint; Affirmative Defenses, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Mario A Roberson, William Michael Brown, Pamela Cremieux, Dorothy P Brown, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Rodney Ricardo Brown by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Summons Mario Roberson, #5 Summons Pamela Cremieux, #6 Summons William Brown, #7 Summons Dorothy Brown)(Bass, Katie)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Ad hoc to Michael S Safren. (GT)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. Ad hoc to Michael S Safren. (GT)
August 30, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/6/2019. (GT)
August 30, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Bass, Katie)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Katie Bass re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. (Bass, Katie)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-20872-4 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5905569), filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bass, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Ricardo Brown
Represented By: Michael S Safren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Pilar C French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Pilar C French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Pamela Cremieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mario A Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: William Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Dorothy P Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?