Clark v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Matthew Clark
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01378
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Amended) by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Jansen, Per)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kamps, Julie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative And Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Kamps, Julie)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Julie M Kamps for defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ian H Morrison for defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Julie M. Kamps FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5956978 (Jansen, Per)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ian H. Morrison FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5956959 (Jansen, Per)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting defendant's #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Prudential Insurance Company of America's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until and including 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 19, 2019 Attorney D Michael Reilly for The Prudential Insurance Company of America added; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/19/2019, (Jansen, Per)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Jansen, Per)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Per Jansen on behalf of Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Jansen, Per)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/4/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/18/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (GT)
September 3, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Receipt # 0981-5906288), filed by Matthew Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Engle, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Clark
Represented By: Aaron Isak Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?