Chen v. Human Rights Commission
Plaintiff: Qian Chen
Defendant: Human Rights Commission
Case Number: 2:2019cv01386
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT BY COURT: The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. Plaintiff's IFP application (Dkt. #1 ) is DENIED and the complaint is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (MW)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is DENIED. The complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All pending motions (Dkts. #4 and #5 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Requesting all Communication and Documents be Submitted via the Telephone, filed by Plaintiff Qian Chen. (MW)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Qian Chen.(MW)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Qian Chen. Objections to R&R due by 9/26/2019, Noting Date 9/30/2019, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment) (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) Chen contacted on 9/5 by TH (MW).
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Qian Chen. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST) Modified on 9/3/2019 to correct file date. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Human Rights Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Human Rights Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qian Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?