Air Line Pilots Association International v. Alaska Airlines Inc
Plaintiff: Air Line Pilots Assoc International and Air Line Pilots Association International
Defendant: Alaska Airlines Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01428
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) without prejudice. (PM)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Air Line Pilots Association International (Dalmat, Darin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Hodges-Howell on behalf of Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc. (Hodges-Howell, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark A. Hutcheson on behalf of Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc. (Hutcheson, Mark)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Harry James Franklyn Korrell, III on behalf of Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc. (Korrell, Harry)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/15/2019. (LC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Air Line Pilots Assoc International Alaska Airlines Inc (ST) Modified on 9/9/2019 to correct name of party as to whom summons issued (KB).
September 9, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (ST)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Marcus Migliore for Plaintiff Air Line Pilots Assoc International, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas N Ciantra for Plaintiff Air Line Pilots Assoc International, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Marcus Migliore FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Air Line Pilots Assoc International (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5915759 (Dalmat, Darin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas N. Ciantra FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Air Line Pilots Assoc International (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5915749 (Dalmat, Darin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Air Line Pilots Assoc International (Dalmat, Darin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against defendant(s) Alaska Airlines Inc (Receipt # 0981-5915713), filed by Air Line Pilots Assoc International. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dalmat, Darin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Air Line Pilots Association International v. Alaska Airlines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Air Line Pilots Assoc International
Represented By: Melissa Jill Greenberg
Represented By: Thomas N Ciantra
Represented By: Marcus Migliore
Represented By: Darin M Dalmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Air Line Pilots Association International
Represented By: Melissa Jill Greenberg
Represented By: Thomas N Ciantra
Represented By: Marcus Migliore
Represented By: Darin M Dalmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines Inc
Represented By: John Hodges-Howell
Represented By: Mark A. Hutcheson
Represented By: Harry James Franklyn Korrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?