Board of Trustees of the Sound Retirement Trust v. Wiitamaki Jewelry Store Inc et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sound Retirement Trust
Defendant: Wiitamaki Jewelry Store Inc and Michael Giron
Case Number: 2:2019cv01433
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/22/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/29/2019. (LC)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Board of Trustees of the Sound Retirement Trust (Lash, Douglas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Michael Giron, Wiitamaki Jewelry Store Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons) (SNP)
September 10, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/17/2019 (if applicable). (SNP)
September 10, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5917952) Attorney Douglas M. Lash added to party Board of Trustees of the Sound Retirement Trust(pty:pla), filed by Board of Trustees of the Sound Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Lash, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Sound Retirement Trust v. Wiitamaki Jewelry Store Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiitamaki Jewelry Store Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Giron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sound Retirement Trust
Represented By: Douglas M. Lash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?