Herreman Aguirre v. Loeza
Plaintiff: Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre
Defendant: Holly Marie Loeza
Case Number: 2:2019cv01443
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of CARLOS SOSA RE: ADDITIONAL ATTONREY'S FEES filed by Counter Defendant Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre, Plaintiff Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre re #9 MOTION to Remand (Sosa, Carlos)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Counter Defendant Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre, Plaintiff Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre, TO RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Remand (Sosa, Carlos)
October 14, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Defendant Holly Marie Loeza, to #9 MOTION to Remand . (Barrera, Paul)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses #1 -1 by Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre.(Sosa, Carlos) Modified on 10/15/2019 to add link to Answer and Counterclaims (PM).
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY, filed by Defendant Holly Marie Loeza, TO RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Barrera, Paul)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE, by Counter Defendant Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre, Plaintiff Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre, to #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sosa, Carlos)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Defendant Holly Marie Loeza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/11/2019, (Barrera, Paul)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBIT 7 re #10 Declaration by Counter Defendant Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre, Plaintiff Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre (Sosa, Carlos)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Holly Marie Loeza (Barrera, Paul)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of CARLOS M. SOSA filed by Counter Defendant Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre, Plaintiff Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre re #9 MOTION to Remand (Sosa, Carlos)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand , filed by Counter Defendant Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre, Plaintiff Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/18/2019, (Sosa, Carlos)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carlos Manuel Sosa, III on behalf of Plaintiff Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre. (Sosa, Carlos)
September 22, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Holly Marie Loeza (Barrera, Paul)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Add and Terminate Parties: corrected docket to reflect Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre as the Counter-Defendant. (PM)
September 11, 2019 Holly Marie Loeza added as Counter-Claimant and Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre added as Counter-Claimant Counter-Defendant per #1 Notice of Removal and #1 -1 Answer. (PM) Modified on 9/11/2019 to identify Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre as Counter-Defendant (PM).
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
September 11, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Holly Marie Loeza (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Records)(Barrera, Paul)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal ; filed by Defendant Holly Marie Loeza. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(Barrera, Paul)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court Clerk by Defendant Holly Marie Loeza (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal)(Barrera, Paul)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-17087-5 KNT; (Receipt # 0981-5920387) Attorney Paul Andre Barrera added to party Holly Marie Loeza(pty:dft), filed by Holly Marie Loeza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Amended Complaint; Answer and Counterclaims, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barrera, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2019: #3 Amended Complaint) (SNP). Modified on 10/15/2019 to identify Attachment #1 (PM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herreman Aguirre v. Loeza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Xavier Herreman Aguirre
Represented By: Carlos Manuel Sosa, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Marie Loeza
Represented By: Paul Andre Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?