Lang et al v. Bellevue School District
Plaintiff: Benjamin Lang, Bin Lang and Ziyi Zhou
Defendant: Bellevue School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv01454
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/12/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
September 12, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of John A. Safarli by Defendant Bellevue School District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit All additional records and proceedings)(Safarli, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-20412-5-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5921863), filed by Bellevue School District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Safarli, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #2 Complaint) (GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lang et al v. Bellevue School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bin Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ziyi Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellevue School District
Represented By: John A Safarli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?