Parker Smith & Feek Inc v. Reph et al
Plaintiff: Parker Smith & Feek Inc
Defendant: Michael J. Reph, Jeffrey A. Colby, Walter R. Winter, Walter R Winter, Jeffrey A Colby and Michael J Reph
Case Number: 2:2019cv01456
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Todd A Hanchett on behalf of Defendants Jeffrey A Colby, Michael J Reph, Walter R Winter. (Hanchett, Todd)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's #7 Motion for Expedited Discovery; denying plaintiff's request for a preservation order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/3/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
October 3, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jeffrey A Colby, Michael J Reph, Walter R Winter.(Pritchard, J.)
September 27, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of David Eckroth filed by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Feider, Darren)
September 27, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Feider, Darren)
September 25, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M McCool. (TW)
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 PRAECIPE to attach document Exhibits G-I re #9 Declaration, by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit I)(Feider, Darren)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on JEFFREY A. COLBY on 9/12/2019, filed by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc. (Feider, Darren)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on WALTER WINTER on 9/13/2019, filed by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc. (Feider, Darren)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on MICHAEL REPH on 9/12/2019, filed by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc. (Feider, Darren)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/1/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Walter Winter filed by Defendants Jeffrey A Colby, Michael J Reph, Walter R Winter re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Pritchard, J.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Michael Reph filed by Defendants Jeffrey A Colby, Michael J Reph, Walter R Winter re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Pritchard, J.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Colby filed by Defendants Jeffrey A Colby, Michael J Reph, Walter R Winter re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Pritchard, J.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE, by Defendants Jeffrey A Colby, Michael J Reph, Walter R Winter, to #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pritchard, J.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney J. Scott Pritchard on behalf of Defendants Jeffrey A Colby, Michael J Reph, Walter R Winter. (Pritchard, J.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew R Kelly on behalf of Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc. (Kelly, Matthew)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Michael J Reph, Walter R Winter and Jeffrey A Colby. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
September 12, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (GT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Allison Goodman filed by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Feider, Darren)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Jennifer Stankovich filed by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Feider, Darren)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Darren A. Feider filed by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feider, Darren)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/27/2019, (Feider, Darren)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc (Feider, Darren)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc (Feider, Darren)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc (Feider, Darren)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Parker Smith & Feek Inc (Feider, Darren)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Parker Smith & Feek Inc. (Feider, Darren)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5921931) Attorney Darren Anthony Feider added to party Parker Smith & Feek Inc(pty:pla), filed by Parker Smith & Feek Inc.(Feider, Darren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker Smith & Feek Inc v. Reph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker Smith & Feek Inc
Represented By: Darren Anthony Feider
Represented By: Matthew R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Reph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Colby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter R. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter R Winter
Represented By: J. Scott Pritchard
Represented By: Karen L O'Connor
Represented By: Todd A Hanchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A Colby
Represented By: J. Scott Pritchard
Represented By: Karen L O'Connor
Represented By: Todd A Hanchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Reph
Represented By: J. Scott Pritchard
Represented By: Karen L O'Connor
Represented By: Todd A Hanchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?