Enterprise Management Limited Inc et al v. Construx Software Builders Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Mary Lippitt and Enterprise Management Limited, Inc.
Defendant: Construx Software Builders, Inc. and Steven C. McConnell
Case Number: 2:2019cv01458
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Construx Software Builders Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/22/2019, (Graham, Lawrence)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
October 22, 2019 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 12/3/2019. (KEB)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/12/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/26/2019, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. No declination forms received. (KEB)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/15/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lawrence D Graham on behalf of Defendants Construx Software Builders Inc, Steve C McConnell. (Graham, Lawrence)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 REDACTION to #1 Complaint,, Exhibit A by Plaintiffs Enterprise Management Limited Inc, Mary Lippitt (Hodges, Benjamin)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint (Exhibit A): The Certificate of Copyright Registration contains personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of Exhibit A using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, Exhibit A has been administratively sealed by the Court. (KB)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin Ormiston on behalf of Plaintiffs Enterprise Management Limited Inc, Mary Lippitt. (Ormiston, Kevin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Steve C McConnell. (GMR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Steve C McConnell by Plaintiffs Enterprise Management Limited Inc, Mary Lippitt (Hodges, Benjamin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GT)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Construx Software Builders Inc. (GT)
September 12, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (GT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Enterprise Management Limited, Inc. (Hodges, Benjamin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement, Unfair Business Practices, and Infringement of Personality Rights against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5922052) Attorney Benjamin J Hodges added to party Enterprise Management Limited, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin J Hodges added to party Mary Lippitt(pty:pla), filed by Enterprise Management Limited, Inc., Mary Lippitt. (Attachments: SEALED DOCUMENT #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121), #4 Summons)(Hodges, Benjamin) Modified on 9/16/2019 to seal Exhibit A - Certificate of Copyright Registration contains person identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to FRCP and LCR 5.2 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enterprise Management Limited Inc et al v. Construx Software Builders Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Construx Software Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Mary Lippitt
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Represented By: Kevin Ormiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enterprise Management Limited, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Represented By: Kevin Ormiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?