Northwest Administrators Inc v. Driscoll's Inc
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: Driscoll's Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01465
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. (PM)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Driscoll's Inc on 9/18/2019 (Reid, Russell)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/22/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/29/2019. (LC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Driscoll's Inc. (GT)
September 13, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) Driscoll's Inc (Receipt # 0981-5923773), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. Driscoll's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Driscoll's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?