Rourke v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Elizabeth Rourke
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and CR Bard Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01471
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/6/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/22/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/6/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James F Rogers for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and CR Bard Incorporated, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James F. Rogers FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Incorporated (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5929451 (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 17, 2019 Per phone call from Betts, Patterson & Mines, James Condo is not participating in this litigation. (SWT)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Richard B North, Jr for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Attorney Natasha A Khachatourians for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated added; per #16 Notice of Attorney Association. (SWT)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Christopher W Tompkins on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AE)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Troy Brenes for Alexandra Elizabeth Rourke, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Troy Brenes FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Alexandra Elizabeth Rourke (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5924820 (Weinstein, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Arizona and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/20/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE)
September 13, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Arizona, Case Number 2:16-cv-03567. In re: MDL 15-02641-PHX-DGC. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #2 MDL 15-02641 Docket Sheet, #3 Notice of Filing Submission, #4 Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order, #5 Email transferring case) (GT).
September 12, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Washington via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #7 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Alexandra Elizabeth Rourke. Document entered in wrong case. All documents must be filed in lead case 15-md-2641. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy Alexander Brenes on behalf of Alexandra Elizabeth Rourke. (Brenes, Troy) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
October 18, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX177608 as to Brian Weinstein. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
October 17, 2016 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3567-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
October 17, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brian D Weinstein on behalf of Alexandra Elizabeth Rourke. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
October 17, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX177608 filed by Alexandra Elizabeth Rourke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rourke v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: James R Condo
Represented By: Amanda Christine Sheridan
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: James R Condo
Represented By: Amanda Christine Sheridan
Represented By: James F Rogers
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: James R Condo
Represented By: Amanda Christine Sheridan
Represented By: James F Rogers
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Elizabeth Rourke
Represented By: Brian Weinstein
Represented By: Troy Brenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?