Elliott v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Loral Elliott
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and CR Bard Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01473
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Defendants' #15 Motion to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines. It is hereby ORDERED that discovery and all pretrial deadlines shall be stayed until November 15, 2019, to provide sufficient time for the Parties to pursue discussions regarding settlement in this matter. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas C. Patton on behalf of Plaintiff Loral Elliott. (Patton, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines, filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/11/2019, (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/23/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James F Rogers for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and CR Bard Incorporated, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 18, 2019 Attorney Natasha A Khachatourians added as counsel for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and CR Bard Incorporated per #10 Notice of Attorney Association. (PM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James F. Rogers FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Incorporated (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5929436 (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Richard B North, Jr for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Christopher W Tompkins on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from the District of Arizona and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (PM)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from the District of Arizona, Case Number 2:16-cv-04495-DGC, re: MDL 15-2641-PHX-DGC. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #2 Email re: case transfer, #3 MDL 15-2641 Docket Sheet, #4 Notice of Filing Submission, #5 Certified Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order) (PM).
September 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. m (PM)
September 12, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Washington via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #5 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
December 21, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
December 21, 2016 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-4495-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
December 21, 2016 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Loral Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]
December 21, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13738686 filed by Loral Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. CR Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: James F Rogers
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: James F Rogers
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loral Elliott
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Jeff Seldomridge
Represented By: Thomas C. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?