Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust et al v. D Ciulla Flooring LLC et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5, Western Washington Floor Covering Industry Fund and Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Defendant: D Ciulla Flooring LLC, Dominic John Ciulla, Dominic John Ciulla dba D Ciulla Flooring and Does & Roes I-X
Case Number: 2:2019cv01479
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of Plaintiff, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 12/2/2019. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/17/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/24/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute, Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5, Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Western Washington Floor Covering Industry Fund (Smith, Wesley)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/23/2019 (if applicable). (KB)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Dominic John Ciulla, D Ciulla Flooring LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (SNP)
September 16, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Dominic John Ciulla, D Ciulla Flooring LLC, Dominic John Ciulla dba D Ciulla Flooring (Receipt # 0981-5925409) Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute (pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Western Washington Floor Covering Industry Fund(pty:pla), filed by Western Washington Floor Covering Industry Fund, Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5, Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute, Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons D Ciulla Flooring LLC, #3 Summons Dominic John Ciulla dba D Ciulla Flooring, #4 Summons Dominic John Ciulla)(Smith, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust et al v. D Ciulla Flooring LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Ciulla Flooring LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic John Ciulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic John Ciulla dba D Ciulla Flooring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does & Roes I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Floor Covering Industry Fund
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?