Littleton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jeni Littleton
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01508
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on USAO-WDWA on 10/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff Jeni Littleton. (Oliver, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (MW)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Summons(es) as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Jeni Littleton.(MW)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(MW)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (TF)
September 23, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Jeni Littleton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Oliver, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Littleton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeni Littleton
Represented By: David P Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?