Barr v. Pigott
Petitioner: Heather Winslow Barr
Respondent: Joseph Stanley Pigott
Case Number: 2:2019cv01534
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Clerk's Note: per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded 14 days from the date of this Order, on December 5th. (PM) (PM) cc: Attorney David Tracy and Defendant vis USPS
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #7 Motion to remand and enter a vexatious litigant order against Respondent Joseph Stanley Pigott. This case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of Washington in and for King County. Ms. Barr may file a supplemental motion for attorney's fees within 14 days. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of Ms. Barr's motion, Mr. Pigott may file a response addressing only the reasonableness of the fees and costs requested. Ms. Barr's request for entry of a vexatious litigant order is DENIED. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case and to assign any future notices of removal of Ms. Barr's divorce petition filed by Mr. Pigott to the undersigned judge. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Attorney David Tracy and Defendant via USPS; cc to Intake team
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Petitioner Heather Winslow Barr re #8 Declaration, #9 Declaration, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 MOTION to Remand (Cunanan, Mathew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of David Tracy filed by Petitioner Heather Winslow Barr re #7 MOTION to Remand (Cunanan, Mathew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Matthew Cunanan filed by Petitioner Heather Winslow Barr re #7 MOTION to Remand (Cunanan, Mathew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand , filed by Petitioner Heather Winslow Barr. Noting Date 10/25/2019, (Cunanan, Mathew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mathew J. Cunanan on behalf of Petitioner Heather Winslow Barr. (Cunanan, Mathew)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SWT) (cc: David Tracy, Joseph Pigott via USPS)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE re: Electronic Service and Filing as to David Tracy, counsel for petitioner. Pursuant to LCR 5(d), "Unless otherwise specifically ordered by the court or directed by the clerk, all counsel are required to electronically file documents through the court's electronic filing system and to comply with the electronic filing procedures for the district." Please take note that as of today's date Mr. Tracy has not registered with ECF. Until registration is completed, service must be effected conventionally. (SWT) (cc: Counsel for petitioner, respondent via USPS)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 17-3-05075-3 SEA; filed by Joseph Stanley Pigott. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Divorce, #2 Exhibits)(SWT)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting defendant's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; recommending the complaint be reviewed before issuance of summons. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SWT) (cc: Defendant, Counsel for plaintiff via USPS) Modified on 9/26/2019 (SWT).
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Brian A Tsuchida, filed by Joseph Stanley Pigott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Petition for Divorce (Dissolution), #4 Exhibits)(GT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barr v. Pigott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph Stanley Pigott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Heather Winslow Barr
Represented By: David Paul Tracy
Represented By: Mathew J. Cunanan
Represented By: Not Registered with ECF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?