Nair et al v. Symmes et al
Plaintiff: Omana Homes LLC, Sukanya Susheel, Jayakrishnan K Nair and Ratner Biomedical Inc
Defendant: John Doe #1, Shelly McLarin, Dawn Mertens, Washington Federal Savings Bank, Amy Atchison, Gary Culver, First Tech Credit Union, Paul Lee, Dainen Penta, Brian Born, Gary Krohn, Richard Symmes, Channa Copeland, County of King, Nancy James, Arag Legal Insurance, David Riley, Rory Livesey, William Foster, Gary, Veristone Capital, Alex Toth, County of Snohomish, Douglas Cameron, City of Mill Creek, Paul Ramsey, M.D., Ermin Ciric and Harborview Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv01577
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas R Cameron on behalf of Defendant Douglas Cameron. (Cameron, Douglas)
November 8, 2019 NOTICE re Defendants Harborview Medical Center and Dr. Paul Ramsey's #13 Answer to Amended Complaint. (PM) "Jury Demand Improperly Indicated". Pursuant to LCR 38(b) and in accordance with FRCP 7, the words JURY DEMAND shall be typed in capital letters on the first page immediately below the name of the pleading, to the right of the name of the case. In order to properly advise the court of this request, counsel must file a separate Jury Demand using the event "Jury Demand " found under the "Other Documents" category."
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Brian P. Waters filed by Defendants Harborview Medical Center, Paul Ramsey, M.D. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Waters, Brian)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Party , filed by Defendants Harborview Medical Center, Paul Ramsey, M.D.. Noting Date 11/29/2019, (Waters, Brian)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Harborview Medical Center, Paul Ramsey, M.D..(Waters, Brian)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Party , filed by Defendants Ermin Ciric, Channa Copeland. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/29/2019, (Young, Saphronia)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Saphronia R Young on behalf of Defendants Ermin Ciric, Channa Copeland. (Young, Saphronia)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/27/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/4/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) Copy mailed to Sukanya Susheel.
October 25, 2019 Parties Ratner Biomedical Inc, Ermin Ciric, Paul Ramsey, and City of Mill Creek added per #9 Amended Complaint (PM)
October 24, 2019 Summons(es) Issued in Paper Form as to defendant(s) Ermin Ciric; Gary Koohn; Paul Ramsay; City of Mill Creek.(ST)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jayakrishnan K Nair.(Nair, Jayakrishnan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian P. Waters on behalf of Unknown Paul Ramsey, M.D., Harborview Medical Center. (Waters, Brian)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gary John Krohn on behalf of Defendant Gary Krohn. (Krohn, Gary)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gabriella Wagner on behalf of Defendant Shelly McLarin. (Wagner, Gabriella)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #2 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff Sukanya Susheel via USPS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: Plaintiff Jayakrishnan K Nair has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiffs Jayakrishnan K Nair, Sukanya Susheel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23-33 for TRO, #2 Proposed Order)(CDA) Modified on 10/3/2019 correct title of document (CDA).
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA098071), filed by Jayakrishnan K Nair, Sukanya Susheel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15, #2 Exhibit 16-22, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nair et al v. Symmes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly McLarin
Represented By: Gabriella Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Mertens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Atchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Tech Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dainen Penta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Born
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Krohn
Represented By: Gary John Krohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Symmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channa Copeland
Represented By: Saphronia R Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arag Legal Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Livesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veristone Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Snohomish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Cameron
Represented By: Douglas R Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mill Creek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ramsey, M.D.
Represented By: Brian P. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ermin Ciric
Represented By: Saphronia R Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harborview Medical Center
Represented By: Brian P. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omana Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sukanya Susheel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayakrishnan K Nair
Represented By: Jayakrishnan K Nair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ratner Biomedical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?