Satcher et al v. Stanislaus et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn V Satcher and James V Satcher
Defendant: Bank of America NA and Selvi Stanislaus
Case Number: 2:2019cv01598
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Ari Y. Brown filed by Plaintiffs Carolyn V Satcher, James V Satcher re #13 MOTION to Remand (Terrell, Beth)
November 22, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Carolyn V Satcher, James V Satcher, TO RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terrell, Beth)
November 18, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Oates filed by Defendant Bank of America NA re #13 MOTION to Remand (Oates, Daniel)
November 18, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE, by Defendant Bank of America NA, to #13 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oates, Daniel)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Deferring Deadline for Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan re parties' #19 Stipulated Motion. The Parties' Joint Status Report and Discovery Plain will be due fourteen days from the date the Court issues an Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand in the event the Court does not remand this case to the Skagit County Superior Court. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION to Defer the Deadline for Filing the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan , filed by Plaintiffs Carolyn V Satcher, James V Satcher. Noting Date 11/12/2019, (Terrell, Beth)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 RECEIPT of CD Containing Exhibit A to Declaration of Daniel J. Oates re #17 Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials. (TH) (placed in one accordion folder in Seattle's filing shelf)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A - CD of Hearing Audio in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Defendant Bank of America NA. inre #16 Declaration. (Oates, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Oates filed by Defendant Bank of America NA re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Oates, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY, filed by Defendant Bank of America NA, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Oates, Daniel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Carolyn V Satcher, James V Satcher, to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terrell, Beth)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiffs Carolyn V Satcher, James V Satcher. Noting Date 11/22/2019, (Terrell, Beth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 REDACTION to #11 Verification of State Court Records, by Defendant Bank of America NA (Attachments: #1 Supplement State Court Records)(Oates, Daniel)
October 22, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #11 Verification of State Court Records, Attachment #1 (Supplement State Court Records) contains personal identifiers (date or birth, social security numbers, bank account information) that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (PM)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Bank of America NA (Attachments: #1 SEALED Supplement State Court Records)(Oates, Daniel) Modified on 10/22/2019 to seal due to sensitive personal identifiers (PM).
October 16, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 MOTION to Dismiss: edited text to indicate corrected version of Motion to Dismiss was filed as Dkt. #9 . (PM)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 PRAECIPE re #8 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Bank of America NA (Oates, Daniel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 PRAECIPE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Bank of America NA (Oates, Daniel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Defendant Bank of America NA re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Oates, Daniel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected Motion filed as Dkt. #9 ) , filed by Defendant Bank of America NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/8/2019, (Oates, Daniel) Modified on 10/16/2019 to indicate corrected version of motion was filed (PM).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/21/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/7/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/14/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP)
October 9, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Skagit County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
October 8, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (SNP)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc for Bank of America, NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bank of America, NA (Oates, Daniel) Modified on 10/8/2019 to add Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc (KB).
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant Bank of America, NA. (Oates, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Skagit County Superior Court, case number 16-2-00194-0; (Receipt # 0981-5956091), filed by Bank of America, NA. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Oates, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Satcher et al v. Stanislaus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn V Satcher
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Ari Y Brown
Represented By: Brittany J Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James V Satcher
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Ari Y Brown
Represented By: Brittany J Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Katie Loberstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selvi Stanislaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?