Jones v. EFinancial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Jones
Defendant: EFinancial LLC, Paraiso Reliant Direct Insurance Services, Inc. and Paraiso Reliant Direct Insurance Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01612
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: Defendants' #16 Unopposed Motion to Modify Date by Which Defendants Efinancial LLC's and Defendant Reliant Direct Insurance Service, Inc.'s Responses to the Complaint are Due. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time (to Modify Date by Which Defendant eFinancial LLC's and Defendant Reliant Direct Insurance Service, Inc.'s Responses to the Complaint are Due, filed by Defendants EFinancial LLC, Paraiso Reliant Direct Insurance Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/4/2019, (Menaldo, Nicola)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Corrected Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, The Court ADMITS Attorney James G Snell for EFinancial LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 CORRECTED APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James G. Snell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendant EFinancial LLC. Receipt No. 0981-6022262 re #13 Application (Menaldo, Nicola) Modified on 11/22/2019 correct title of document (CDA).
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James G. Snell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant EFinancial LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6022262 (Snell, James)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Debra Rae Bernard for Defendant EFinancial LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Debra R. Bernard FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant EFinancial LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6011342 (Menaldo, Nicola)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant EFinancial LLC's #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Both Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 10, 2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/10/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/17/2020, Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unapposed Motion to Modify Date by Which Defendant Efinancial LLC's Response to the Complaint is Due and Dates in Initial Scheduling Order, filed by Defendant EFinancial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/12/2019, (Menaldo, Nicola)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nicola Menaldo on behalf of Defendant EFinancial LLC. (Menaldo, Nicola)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/27/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/4/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Paraiso Reliant Direct Insurance Services, Inc. on 10/14/2019, filed by Plaintiff Calvin Jones. (Draluck, Eric)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on eFinancial LLC on 10/10/2019, filed by Plaintiff Calvin Jones. (Draluck, Eric)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) EFinancial LLC, Paraiso Reliant Direct Insurance Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
October 9, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Avi R Kaufman for Plaintiff Calvin Jones, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Avi R. Kaufman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Calvin Jones (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5958251 (Draluck, Eric)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of the Telephone Consumer Protection Act (47 U.S.C. 227) against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5958245) Attorney Eric R Draluck added to party Calvin Jones(pty:pla), filed by Calvin Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons: EFinancial LLC, #3 Summons Summons: Paraiso Reliant Direct Insurance Services, Inc.)(Draluck, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. EFinancial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Jones
Represented By: Eric R Draluck
Represented By: Avi R Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFinancial LLC
Represented By: James G Snell
Represented By: Debra Rae Bernard
Represented By: Nicola Menaldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paraiso Reliant Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paraiso Reliant Direct Insurance Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?