Sharpe et al v. Whidbey Island Public Health District
Plaintiff: David Sharpe and Carol Sharpe
Defendant: Whidbey Island Public Health District
Case Number: 2:2019cv01627
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 CONFORMED COPY received re #8 Remand Letter to Island County Superior Court. (ERA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER to Island County Superior Court Remanding Case back per #7 Order. (ERA)
October 23, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #7 Order to Remand to Island County Superior Court. (ERA)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REMAND TO STATE COURT re #5 Stipulated MOTION to Remand filed by Whidbey Island Public Health District by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. No declination forms received. (KEB)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION to Remand, filed by Defendant Whidbey Island Public Health District. Noting Date 10/22/2019, (Steiner, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand To State Court, filed by Plaintiffs Carol Sharpe, David Sharpe. Noting Date 11/15/2019, (McCanna, James)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/18/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Island County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
October 11, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (GT)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Island County Superior Court, case number 19-2-00597-15; (Receipt # 0981-5961738) Attorney Justin A Steiner added to party Whidbey Island Public Health District (pty:dft), filed by Whidbey Island Public Health District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Appearance, #5 Exhibit D - State Notice of Removal)(Steiner, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharpe et al v. Whidbey Island Public Health District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sharpe
Represented By: James K McCanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Sharpe
Represented By: James K McCanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whidbey Island Public Health District
Represented By: Justin A Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?