The Highlands North Condominium Association v. Allied Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: The Highlands North Condominium Association
Defendant: Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Doe Insurance Companies 1-10 and AMCO Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01660
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 7-10 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 12/7/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 2/25/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/10/2020, Discovery completed by 8/10/2020, Dispositive motions due by 9/8/2020, Motions in Limine due by 11/9/2020, Pretrial Order due by 11/23/2020, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits are to be submitted by 11/30/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7 - 10 Court Days. (Stein, Daniel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Shickich, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Reset Deadlines -- By agreement of the parties, the initial case scheduling deadlines are reset as follows: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/26/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/3/2019, Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2019. (VE)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Shickich, Daniel)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allied Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Allied Holdings, Inc. for AMCO Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Shickich, Daniel)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Allied Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Shickich, Daniel)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Highlands North Condominium Association (Stein, Daniel)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/5/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/12/2019, Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 21, 2019 Attorney Daniel Francis Shickich added for AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company; per #3 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Geoff J M Bridgman on behalf of Defendants AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Bridgman, Geoff)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (SNP)
October 18, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5967976), filed by The Highlands North Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons AMCO, #3 Summons Nationwide, #4 Summons Allied)(Stein, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Highlands North Condominium Association v. Allied Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Daniel Francis Shickich
Represented By: Geoff J M Bridgman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Francis Shickich
Represented By: Geoff J M Bridgman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Francis Shickich
Represented By: Geoff J M Bridgman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Highlands North Condominium Association
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Represented By: Colin Roads Crug
Represented By: Jerry H. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?