Trubow et al v. Morisky et al
Plaintiff: Steven Trubow, MMAS Research, LLC and MMAS Research LLC
Defendant: Morisky Medication Adherence Research, LLC, Donald Morisky, Susan Morisky, Phillip Morisky, Marty Morisky and Morisky Medication Adherence Research LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01670
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY, filed by Defendant Donald Morisky, TO RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Susan Morisky (Mason, Christopher)
December 13, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs MMAS Research LLC, Steven Trubow, TO RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Haring-Larson, Christina)
December 9, 2019 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #27 Response to Motion For Remand (Mason, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of F. Christopher Austin filed by Defendant Donald Morisky re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Mason, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Defendant Donald Morisky, to #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Mason, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs MMAS Research LLC, Steven Trubow, to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Susan Morisky. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Susan Morisky's Motion to Dismiss for Want of Jurisdiction)(Haring-Larson, Christina)
November 27, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Filed by Defendant Morisky Medication Adherence Research LLC. Noting Date 12/13/2019, (Petrak, Keith)
November 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Want of Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by Defendant Morisky Medication Adherence Research LLC. Noting Date 12/20/2019, (Petrak, Keith)
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Susan Morisky. Filed by Defendants Donald Morisky, Susan Morisky. Noting Date 12/13/2019, (Mason, Christopher)
November 21, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Philip Morisky filed by Defendant Morisky Medication Adherence Research LLC re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Want of Personal Jurisdiction (Zuniga, Jacob)
November 21, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Keith D. Petrak filed by Defendant Morisky Medication Adherence Research LLC re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Want of Personal Jurisdiction (Zuniga, Jacob)
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Want of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Morisky Medication Adherence Research LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/20/2019 12/13/2019, (Zuniga, Jacob) Modified on 12/2/2019 (MW).
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jacob Alejandro Zuniga on behalf of Defendant Morisky Medication Adherence Research LLC. (Zuniga, Jacob)
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Christopher Mason filed by Defendant Susan Morisky re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Susan Morisky (Mason, Christopher)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Susan Morisky, filed by Defendant Susan Morisky. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 12/13/2019 12/6/2019, (Mason, Christopher) Modified on 12/2/2019 (MW).
November 12, 2019 ***Deadlines terminated. The Court notifies the parties that the deadlines contained in the #9 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT are suspended pending the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (VE)
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Christina Haring-Larson In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs MMAS Research LLC, Steven Trubow re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Haring-Larson, Christina)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Plaintiffs MMAS Research LLC, Steven Trubow. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Remand) Noting Date 12/13/2019 12/6/2019, (Haring-Larson, Christina) Modified on 12/2/2019 (MW).
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Donald Morisky, Susan Morisky (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Schedule, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Notice of Appearance, #9 Note for Motion Pro Hac Vice, #10 Motion Pro Hac Vice, #11 Proposed Order Pro Hac vice, #12 Change of Address, #13 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice, #14 Note For Motion - Dismiss Susan Morisky, #15 Motion to Dismiss, #16 Declaration of Susan Morisky, #17 Declaration of Christopher Mason, #18 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #19 Praecipe, #20 Corrected Motion to Dismiss, #21 Notice of Appearance, #22 Note for Motion Extend Time, #23 Motion to Extend Time, #24 Declaration of F. Christopher Austin, #25 Proposed Order Extending Time, #26 Note For Motion Protective Order, #27 Motion for Protective Order, #28 Declaration of Shaunta Knibb, #29 Declaration of Christopher Mason, #30 Proposed Order Protective Order, #31 Opposition to Protective Order, #32 Declaration of Steven Trubow, #33 Declaration of Christina Haring-Larson, #34 Opposition of Motion to Extend Time, #35 Praecipe, #36 Corrected Declaration of Steven Trubow, #37 Reply - Protective Order, #38 Reply - Extend Time, #39 Order Denying Protection Order, #40 Order Granting Extend Time, #41 Certificate of Service Donald and Susan Morisky, #42 Certificate of Service Morisky Medication Research LLC, #43 MMAR Answer, #44 Note for Motion - Default, #45 Motion for Default, #46 Declaration of Christina Haring-Larson - Motion to Dismiss, #47 Note for Motion to Dismiss MMAR, #48 Re-Note for Motion to Dismiss MMAR, #49 Order Denying Motion For Default, #50 Praecipe - Declaration of Susan Morisky, #51 Corrected Declaration of Susan Morisky)(Mason, Christopher)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney F. Christopher Austin for Defendants Donald Morisky and Susan Morisky, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY F. Christopher Austin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Donald Morisky, Susan Morisky (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5984613 (Mason, Christopher)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SNP)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (Attachments: #1 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121)) (SNP)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/15/2019, Joint Status Report due by 11/22/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Morisky Medication Adherence Research LLC (Petrak, Keith)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by MMAS Research LLC (Haring-Larson, Christina)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Donald Morisky, Susan Morisky. (Mason, Christopher)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP)
October 18, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) must file aCorporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/25/2019. (SNP)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
October 18, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-19872-9 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5969659), filed by Susan Morisky, Donald Morisky. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Answer and Counterclaims, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mason, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trubow et al v. Morisky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Trubow
Represented By: Christina L Haring-Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMAS Research, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMAS Research LLC
Represented By: Christina L Haring-Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morisky Medication Adherence Research, LLC
Represented By: Keith David Petrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Morisky
Represented By: Christopher Cavallar Mason
Represented By: F Christopher Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Morisky
Represented By: Christopher Cavallar Mason
Represented By: F Christopher Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Morisky
Represented By: Keith David Petrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Morisky
Represented By: Keith David Petrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morisky Medication Adherence Research LLC
Represented By: Keith David Petrak
Represented By: Jacob Alejandro Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?