Shattuck v. Fred Meyer Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jane Shattuck
Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 21, Fred Meyer Stores, Inc., Fred Meyer Inc and United Food and Commercial Workers Local 21
Case Number: 2:2019cv01677
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/24/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/10/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/17/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; by Fred Meyer Inc.(Hammond, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Jane Shattuck (Moody, Rodney)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney James Gerard McGuinness. Filed by Defendant United Food and Commercial Workers Local 21. (McGuinness, James) Modified firm address on 10/24/2019 (DS).
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint; by United Food and Commercial Workers Local 21.(McGuinness, James)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST)
October 21, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 21 must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement (if applicable) by 10/28/2019. (ST)
October 21, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (ST)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc., Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fred Meyer Stores, Inc. (Hammond, Ryan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 19-2-08452-31; (Receipt # 0981-5970831), filed by Fred Meyer Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Records Complaint #3 Exhibit)(Hammond, Ryan) Modified on 10/21/2019 to reflect (2) are actually state court records. (ST) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2019: #4 Complaint) (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shattuck v. Fred Meyer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 21
Represented By: James Gerard McGuinness
Represented By: Aaron M Streepy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Alyesha Dotson
Represented By: Ryan Paul Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Meyer Inc
Represented By: Alyesha Dotson
Represented By: Ryan Paul Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers Local 21
Represented By: James Gerard McGuinness
Represented By: Aaron M Streepy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Shattuck
Represented By: Rodney R Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?