Ursal v. Amazon Inc
Plaintiff: Sheela Ursal
Defendant: Amazon Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01701
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 1/30/2020. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein. (RM)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Image/Document #9 Standing Order for Civil Cases (Service of image is attached). (RM)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (RM).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/30/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/23/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re #4 Verification of State Court Records by Defendant Amazon Inc (Redekopp, Ryan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
October 23, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Amazon Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Redekopp, Ryan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon Inc (Redekopp, Ryan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Ryan D. Redekopp re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Amazon Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Redekopp, Ryan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-27424-7 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5975628), filed by Amazon Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Redekopp, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ursal v. Amazon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheela Ursal
Represented By: Rodney R Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Inc
Represented By: Ryan Drew Redekopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?